This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 09:21:18 (UTC).

United States of America v. Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Taylor Energy Company, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Michael North. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02910

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Michael North

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Shea Diaz

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

150 M St. Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Samantha Morgan Ricci

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

150 M Street Nw, Ste 5.1402

Washington, DC 20002

Scott Cernich

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

150 M St Ne

Washington, DC 20002

Peter M. Mansfield

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

650 Poydras St., Suite 1600

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard M. Gladstein

Attorney at U. S. Department of Justice

P. O. Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Mark C Elmer

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice, ENRD

999 18Th Street, South Terrace, Ste 370

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Lauren Courtney Mastio

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Thomas A. Casey, Jr.

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Carl David Rosenblum

Attorney at Jones Walker (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Taylor Katherine Wimberly

Attorney at Jones Walker LLP

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 5100

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) ORDER denying #45 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/17/2020. (caa) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

45 #2

Proposed Pleading

45 #1

Proposed Order

#45

(#45) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File SurReply Memorandum in Opposition to Taylor Energy's Rule 56(D) Motion for Discovery re: rec. doc. 27 by United States of America. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Gladstein, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

27 #8

Exhibit

27 #7

Exhibit

27 #2

Exhibit

27 #1

Memorandum in Support

#27

(#47) ORDER granting in part #27 Motion for Discovery as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/16/2020. (caa) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

8 #6

Exhibit

8 #5

Exhibit

8 #4

Exhibit

#6

(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/02/2020.(ko) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.. (bm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Related Case(s) by United States of America of related case(s) 20-1720, 18-14046. (Diaz, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Scott Cernich, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice.** (mm) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

110 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER denying #45 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/17/2020. (caa) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. re #27 MOTION for Discovery Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) on the United States' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (caa) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/16/2020. (caa) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) ORDER granting in part #27 Motion for Discovery as stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 12/16/2020. (caa) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #43 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Discovery Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) on United States Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File SurReply Memorandum in Opposition to Taylor Energy's Rule 56(D) Motion for Discovery re: rec. doc. 27 by United States of America. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Gladstein, Richard) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by United States of America re #28 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Diaz, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Discovery Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56(d) on United States Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Rosenblum, Carl) Modified referral on 12/16/2020 (bm). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. re #29 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Nos. 18-14046, 20-1720, 20-2910. (Rosenblum, Carl) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/7/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Bench Trial set for 8/2/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(ko) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Diaz, Rebecca) Modified text/updated answer due date on 11/10/2020 (mm). (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Liability on United States' Second Claim. **Document lists counsel of record, Scott Cernich, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel. This Attorney could not be added to the case when the Complaint was filed because the Attorney was not admitted to this to Court. A Motion to Enroll this Attorney in the case is now required.** (mm) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment for Liability on United States' Second Claim by United States of America. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Proposed Order, #8 Notice of Submission)(Gladstein, Richard) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Document lists counsel of record, Scott Cernich, for a party in this action who has not been admitted to practice in this court. Any party not appearing in proper person must be represented by a member of the bar of this court (L.R. 83.2.4). Please see Local Rule 83.2.2 for this court's Procedures for Admission and Local Rule 83.2.5 for Visiting Attorneys to appear and participate Pro Hac Vice.** (mm) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. Judge Eldon E. Fallon, Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/02/2020.(ko) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (bm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C.. (bm) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Related Case(s) by United States of America of related case(s) 20-1720, 18-14046. (Diaz, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Taylor Energy Company, L.L.C. (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Rebecca Shea Diaz added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Diaz, Rebecca) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/27/2020) (bm). (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Christian Elmer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter M. Mansfield