This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 at 07:40:42 (UTC).

United States of America v. Taurus PTIII G2 Pistol, Cal:9, Serial Number TL080031

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Taurus PTIII G2 Pistol, Cal 9, Serial Number TL080031. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nanette K. Laughrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04152

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nanette K. Laughrey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Taurus PTIII G2 Pistol, Cal:9, Serial Number TL080031

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office-KCMO

400 E 9Th Street, Suite 5510

Kansas City, MO 64106

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Troyvante Walker-Hughes by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jovonte Garrett by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jaron Sayles by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/23/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against Taurus PTIII G2 Pistol, Cal:9, Serial Number TL080031 filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Javonte Garrett by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Javonte Garrett by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jovonte Garrett by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Jaron Sayles by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Troyvante Walker-Hughes by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 7/23/19 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against Taurus PTIII G2 Pistol, Cal:9, Serial Number TL080031 filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 10/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.