This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2020 at 10:03:54 (UTC).

United States of America v. Szymanski

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Szymanski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Pepper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01481

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela Pepper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Ewa E Szymanski

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Francis Bresnahan, II

Attorney at United States Department of Justice (DC)

555 4Th St Nw, Po Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044-7238

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ewa E Szymanski - Waiver sent on 9/23/2020. (Bresnahan, James)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Bresnahan, II on behalf of United States of America. Attorney(s) appearing: James F. Bresnahan II (Bresnahan, James)

1 #2

Summons Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ewa E Szymanski by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons )(Bresnahan, James) Modified on 9/23/2020 (amb).

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Ewa E Szymanski - Waiver sent on 9/23/2020. (Bresnahan, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Ewa E Szymanski. (amb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bresnahan, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James Francis Bresnahan, II on behalf of United States of America. Attorney(s) appearing: James F. Bresnahan II (Bresnahan, James)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ewa E Szymanski by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons )(Bresnahan, James) Modified on 9/23/2020 (amb).

    Read MoreRead Less