This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 08:35:28 (UTC).

United States of America v. Smith et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00535

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Temple Theater For the Performing Arts

Roger L. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Genesis Martinez-Federal Gov

Attorney at U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

555 4Th Street Nw, Room 6240

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Temple Theater For the Performing Arts waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Martinez-Federal Gov, Genesis) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Roger L. Smith waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Martinez-Federal Gov, Genesis) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Roger L. Smith, Temple Theater For the Performing Arts. (MGB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Roger L. Smith, Temple Theater For the Performing Arts, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Temple Theater For the Performing Arts waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Martinez-Federal Gov, Genesis) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Roger L. Smith waiver sent on 9/17/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Martinez-Federal Gov, Genesis) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Roger L. Smith, Temple Theater For the Performing Arts. (MGB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Roger L. Smith, Temple Theater For the Performing Arts, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less