This case was last updated from PACER on 09/01/2019 at 07:32:47 (UTC).

United States of America v. Shadrick et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2019 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Shadrick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Vickie Shadrick

LVNV Funding, LLC

William L. Shadrick

Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc.

Unknown Heirs of William Shadrick

Unknown Spouse of Vickie Shadrick

Keith Stafford

Unknown Spouse of Dwight Williams

Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of William Shadrick

Dwight Williams

Tammy Stafford

Not Classified By Court

Warning Order Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Melissa R. Dixon

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder Law Offices, PLLC

1222 1/2 N. Main Street, Suite 2

London, KY 40741

R. Scott Wilder

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder Law Offices, PLLC

1222 1/2 N. Main Street, Suite 2

London, KY 40741

Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Kevin A. Francke

101 N. Main Street

Henderson, KY 42420

Nicholas P. Goetz

Attorney at Gordon Law Offices, PSC

121 W. Second Street

Owensboro, KY 42302

Travis L. Holtrey

Attorney at Foreman Watson Holtrey, LLP

530 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

Matthew C. Tierney

Attorney at Stevenson & Land

100 West Third Street, Suite 302

Owensboro, KY 42302

Marty G. Jacobs

1110 Frederica Street

Owensboro, KY 42301

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Summons Keith Stafford and Tammy Stafford

#21

(#21) NOTICE of summonses to be issued by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons Keith Stafford and Tammy Stafford) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#20

(#20) Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Keith Stafford, Tammy Stafford. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#19

(#19) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to LVNV Funding, LLC COMPLETED on 8/2/2019. (JM) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#18

(#18) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #9 for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Travis L. Holtrey for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Unknown Heirs of William L. Shadrick.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#10

(#17) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #10 Motion for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Nicholas P. Goetz for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Unknown Spouse of Dwight Williams.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

9 #2

Proposed Order

9 #1

Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon

#9

(#18) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #9 for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Travis L. Holtrey for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Unknown Heirs of William L. Shadrick.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit c

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Cover Sheet

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of summonses to be issued by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons Keith Stafford and Tammy Stafford) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Keith Stafford, Tammy Stafford. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to LVNV Funding, LLC COMPLETED on 8/2/2019. (JM) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #9 for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Travis L. Holtrey for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Unknown Heirs of William L. Shadrick.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #10 Motion for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Nicholas P. Goetz for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Unknown Spouse of Dwight Williams.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #8 for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Marty G. Jacobs for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for Dwight Williams.) cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/29/2019 granting #11 Motion for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Kevin A. Francke for Warning Order Attorney appointed (Unknown Spouses of Unknown Heirs of William L. Shadrick.) cc: Counsel(JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/26/2019 granting #12 Motion for Appointment of Warning Order Attorney. Attorney Matthew C. Tierney for Warning Order Attorney appointed (for the Unknown Spouse of Vickie Shadrick.) cc: Counsel (JM) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Issued as to Keith Stafford, Tammy Stafford. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es).**Counsel requested ATTESTED copies for Service. Those copies emailed this date to counsel** (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Tammy Stafford) (DJT) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Unknown Spouse of Vickie Shadrick by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Unknown Spouse of Dwight Williams by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for Unknown Heirs of William Shadrick by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of filing summonses by United States of America re #6 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons Keith Stafford, #2 Summons Tammy Stafford) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Subsidy Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Affidavit Proof of Account, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Obituary of William Shadrick, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Judgment Lien, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Judgment Lien, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Field Inspection Report) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Vickie Shadrick. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • (#4) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/12/2019: This action is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for determination of nondispositive matters, pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate Judge is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. IT IS SO ORDERED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, K. Lovell (EAS) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC, Vickie Shadrick, William L. Shadrick. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (AME) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Baptist Health Madisonville, Inc., LVNV Funding, LLC, Vickie Shadrick, William L. Shadrick (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2898100), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit c, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (AME) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.