This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2020 at 09:06:18 (UTC).

United States of America v. Michael D. Sellers

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Michael D Sellers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Walter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07762

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

MICHAEL D. SELLERS

Garnishee

Bank of America, N.A

Po Box 15047

Wilmington, DE 19850

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zoran Joseph Segina

Attorney at AUSA - US Attorney Office

300 North Los Angeles Street Room 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Brendan T Mockler

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516Aa

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order on Motion for Order #14 SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE served on 9/25/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#14

(#14) ORDER TERMINATING THE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT #13 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the August 27, 2020 Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Garnishee Bank of America, N.A. is terminated. (iv) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

13 #2

Proof of Service

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) REQUEST for Order for TERMINATING THE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(10)] [BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order #10 SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES OF FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT served on 9/14/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

#11

(#11) ANSWER OF GARNISHEE BANK OF AMERICA, N.A to Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.(iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#10

(#10) FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT #9 by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

9 #2

Proof of Service

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Order FOR ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT[JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES] [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(7)] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #7 , Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 served on 8/28/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#7

(#7) WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (iv) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT #4 by Judge John F. Walter. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of continuing garnishment with respect to Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.; and The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Michael D. Sellers. (iv) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #2

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR

1 #1

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE

#1

(#1) APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order on Motion for Order #14 SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE served on 9/25/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TERMINATING THE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT #13 by Judge John F. Walter. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the August 27, 2020 Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Garnishee Bank of America, N.A. is terminated. (iv) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST for Order for TERMINATING THE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(10)] [BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Order #10 SERVICE ON DEFENDANT AND GARNISHEE JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES OF FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT served on 9/14/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER OF GARNISHEE BANK OF AMERICA, N.A to Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.(iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT #9 by Judge John F. Walter. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Order FOR ENTRY OF FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT[JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES] [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(7)] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #7 , Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 served on 8/28/2020. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT issued. (iv) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR issued. (iv) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT #4 by Judge John F. Walter. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of continuing garnishment with respect to Garnishee Bank of America, N.A.; and The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Michael D. Sellers. (iv) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Michael D. Sellers TO GARNISHEE BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Text Only Entry re Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . This case has been assigned to United States District Judge John F. Walter. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:20-cv-07762-JFW. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (et) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE JOHN BROWN & ASSOCIATES [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zoran Joseph Segina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan T Mockler