This case was last updated from PACER on 03/04/2020 at 14:46:49 (UTC).

United States of America v. Rivers-Hutchins et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Rivers-Hutchins. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Cameron McGowan Currie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02392

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cameron McGowan Currie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC

Little Angels Day Care of Columbia LLC

Deutsche Bank National Trust

Vernece Rivers-Hutchins

South Carolina Department of Revenue

Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC

Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Derrick Hutchins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Douglas Barnett

Attorney at US Attorneys Office

1441 Main Street, Suite 500

Columbia, SC 29201

Defendant Attorneys

William Taylor Stanley

Attorney at Turner Padget Graham and Laney PA

Po Box 1473, 1901 Main Street 17Th Floor

Columbia, SC 29202

John Aaron Ecton

Attorney at Ecton Law Firm PA

7911 Broad River Road, Suite 100

Irmo, SC 29063

Kiera Courtney Dillon

Attorney at SC Department of Revenue

Po Box 12265

Columbia, SC 29211-9979

 

Court Documents

#1

(#25) Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and to Add a Party by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 proposed First Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Barnett, John) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #5

Affidavit of Service for South Carolina Department of Revenue

6 #1

Affidavit of Service for Vernece Rivers-Hutchins

#33

(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Derrick Hutchins served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Derrick Hutchins)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#30

(#30) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Deutsche Bank National Trust, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment)(Stanley, William) Modified to remove filer not listed on document and to edit text on 12/10/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#3

(#3) LIS PENDENS by United States of America. (kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

33 #1

Affidavit of Service as to Derrick Hutchins

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust, Little Angels Day Care of Columbia LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, South Carolina Department of Revenue. (kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#27

(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust, Derrick Hutchins, Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, South Carolina Department of Revenue filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/2/2020 (Barnett, John) Modified to edit text on 12/3/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

30 #1

Exhibit A - Mortgage

#29

(#29) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins.(Ecton, John) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#32

(#32) Summons Issued as to Derrick Hutchins. (cbru, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

6 #3

Affidavit of Service for Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC

#31

(#31) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

6 #4

Affidavit of Service for Ocwen Loan Servicing

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Vernece Rivers-Hutchins served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; South Carolina Department of Revenue served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, #2 Acceptance of Service by Kana Rahman, Esquire on behalf of Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, #3 Affidavit of Service for Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, #4 Affidavit of Service for Ocwen Loan Servicing, #5 Affidavit of Service for South Carolina Department of Revenue)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

30 #2

Exhibit B - Assignment

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Derrick Hutchins served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service as to Derrick Hutchins)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Summons Issued as to Derrick Hutchins. (cbru, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Deutsche Bank National Trust, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B - Assignment)(Stanley, William) Modified to remove filer not listed on document and to edit text on 12/10/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint, by Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins.(Ecton, John) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust, Derrick Hutchins, Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, South Carolina Department of Revenue filed by United States of America. Service due by 3/2/2020 (Barnett, John) Modified to edit text on 12/3/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 12/2/2019.(cbru, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint and to Add a Party by United States of America. Response to Motion due by 12/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 proposed First Amended Complaint)No proposed order.(Barnett, John) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(Barnett, John) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Joint Rule 26(f) Report by United States of America.(Barnett, John) Modified to edit text on 11/14/2019 (cbru, ). (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Report due by 11/13/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/5/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/4/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/4/2020, Discovery due by 4/29/2020, Motion in Limine due by 9/14/2020, Motions due by 5/13/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/22/2020, Bench Trial Deadline 10/5/2020, ADR Statement due by 6/10/2020, Mediation Due by 7/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Cameron McGowan Currie on 10/9/2019. (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE: Defendant South Carolina Department of Revenue is reminded that Local Rule 26.01 includes Interrogatories F and G which are directed to defendants only. Please file answers to these interrogatories no later than October 23, 2019. (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by South Carolina Department of Revenue.(Dillon, Kiera) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. (Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC answer due 10/31/2019; Vernece Rivers-Hutchins answer due 10/31/2019) Filing corrected for event type (cbru, ) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; Vernece Rivers-Hutchins served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019; South Carolina Department of Revenue served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, #2 Acceptance of Service by Kana Rahman, Esquire on behalf of Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, #3 Affidavit of Service for Little Angels Day Care of Columbia, LLC, #4 Affidavit of Service for Ocwen Loan Servicing, #5 Affidavit of Service for South Carolina Department of Revenue)(Barnett, John) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LIS PENDENS by United States of America. (kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Deutsche Bank National Trust, Little Angels Day Care of Columbia LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, South Carolina Department of Revenue. (kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Deutsche Bank National Trust, Little Angels Day Care of Columbia LLC, Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC, Vernece Rivers-Hutchins, South Carolina Department of Revenue, filed by United States of America. Service due by 11/21/2019(kbos) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less