This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:36:57 (UTC).

United States of America v. Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097 et al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel B. Toomey and Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel B. Toomey

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Gretchen Camp

Richard Everett Camp, Jr.

Defendants

Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, Florida 32097

Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034

Real Property, Including All Improvements Thereon and Appurtenances Thereto, Located at 27488 Highway 129 South, Metter, Candler County, Georgia 30439

Interested Party

Tax Commissioner of Candler County, Georgia

Metter, GA 30439

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bonnie Ames Glober

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM

Suite 700, 300 N Hogan St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Claimant Attorneys

Jesse B. Wilkison

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Matthew R. Kachergus

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Camille Elizabeth Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Bryan E. DeMaggio

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

William J. Sheppard

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Elizabeth Louise White

Attorney at Sheppard, White, Kachergus, & DeMaggio PA

215 Washington St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Curtis Scott Fallgatter

Attorney at Fallgatter & Catlin, PA

200 E Forsyth St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROOF of service by United States of America as to 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2019. (MD) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

16 #1

Advertisement Details

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan E. DeMaggio on behalf of Gretchen Camp (DeMaggio, Bryan) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE of Purported Interested Party re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of lis pendens filed by Patty Sikes, Tax Commissioner, Candler County, Georgia. (JSG) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text (JSG). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against all Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JSG) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by Gretchen Camp, Richard Everett Camp, Jr. (DeMaggio, Bryan) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#11

(#11) CLAIM of Ownership by Richard Everett Camp. (Fallgatter, Curtis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Scott Fallgatter on behalf of Richard Everett Camp (Fallgatter, Curtis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#7

(#7) PROOF of service by United States of America as to 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, FL 32097 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#16

(#16) PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication March 29, 2019 - April 27, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Details)(Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

#13

(#13) PROOF of service by United States of America, US Marshal 285 form for posting of property - 27488 Hway 129, S., Metter, Candler County, Ga. (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: official government internet site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication March 29, 2019 - April 27, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Advertisement Details)(Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Case Stayed. (JSG) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 motion to stay: this case is stayed until further Order and the Clerk shall administratively close the file. No later than 11/12/2019 the parties shall file a joint notice advising the Court of the status of the criminal cases against Richard Everett Camp, Jr., and against Gretchen Camp. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 5/10/2019. (SRW) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint MOTION to stay Civil Forfeiture Proceeding by Gretchen Camp, Richard Everett Camp, Jr. (DeMaggio, Bryan) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROOF of service by United States of America, US Marshal 285 form for posting of property - 27488 Hway 129, S., Metter, Candler County, Ga. (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Scott Fallgatter on behalf of Richard Everett Camp (Fallgatter, Curtis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CLAIM of Ownership by Richard Everett Camp. (Fallgatter, Curtis) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan E. DeMaggio on behalf of Gretchen Camp (DeMaggio, Bryan) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) VERIFIED CLAIM by Gretchen Camp (DeMaggio, Bryan). Modified on 5/3/2019 to edit text (JSG). (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE of Purported Interested Party re #1 Complaint, #3 Notice of lis pendens filed by Patty Sikes, Tax Commissioner, Candler County, Georgia. (JSG) Modified on 4/23/2019 to edit text (JSG). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROOF of service by United States of America as to 76437 Timber Creek Boulevard, Yulee, Nassau County, FL 32097 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF of service by United States of America as to 3240 S. Fletcher Avenue, Unit 445, Fernandina Beach, Nassau County, Florida 32034 executed on 4/10/2019. (JSG) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/29/2019. (MD) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of lis pendens by United States of America (Glober, Bonnie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against all Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JSG) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.