This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2020 at 11:19:19 (UTC).

United States Of America v. Price

Case Summary

On 06/02/2020 United States Of America filed an Other lawsuit against Price. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan P. Watters. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan P. Watters

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Larry Wayne Price, Jr.

Intervenor Defendant

Three Blind Mice, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel P. Bubar

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office

310 First Street, S.W. Room 906

Roanoke, VA 24008

Steven Randall Ramseyer

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office

180 West Main Street, Suite B19

Abingdon, VA 24210

Krista Consiglio Frith

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office - Roanoke

310 First Street, Sw, Suite 906

Roanoke, VA 24008

Defendant Attorneys

Walter William Gust

Attorney at Gentry Locke Rakes & Moore

P.O. Box 40013

Roanoke, VA 24022-0013

Justin Michael Lugar

Attorney at United States Attorneys Office - Roanoke

310 First Street, Sw, Suite 906

Roanoke, VA 24008

Kevin Walker Holt

Attorney at Gentry Locke Rakes & Moore

P.O. Box 40013

Roanoke, VA 24022-0013

Thomas Jack Bondurant, Jr.

Attorney at Gentry Locke Rakes & Moore

P.O. Box 40013

Roanoke, VA 24022-0013

Jennifer Scott DeGraw

Attorney at Gentry Locke Rakes & Moore

10 Franklin Road, Se, Suite 900

Roanoke, VA 24011

Ryan J. Gustafson

Attorney at MATOVICH, KELLER & HUSO, P.C.

2812 First Avenue North, Suite 225, Po Box 1098

Billings, MT 59103-1098

Geoffrey R. Keller

Attorney at MATOVICH, KELLER & HUSO, P.C.

2812 First Avenue North, Suite 225, Po Box 1098

Billings, MT 59103-1098

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Randall G. Nelson

Attorney at NELSON LAW FIRM, P.C.

2619 St. Johns Avenue, Suite E

Billings, MT 59102

John Edward Jessee

Attorney at Jessee & Read

P.O. Box 1506

Abingdon, VA 24212-1506

Joshua F.P. Long

Attorney at Woods Rogers PLC

P.O. Box 14125

Roanoke, VA 24038-4125

 

Court Documents

#103

(#103) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Gustafson on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Gustafson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#102

(#102) ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/2/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

101 #1

*Restricted*

#101

(#101) Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00027. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (EMH, ) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#100

(#100) Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Montana, Billings Division. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/1/2020. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#99

(#99) NOTICE by United States Of America (Frith, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

#98

(#98) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on June 10, 2019 before Honorable Judge James P. Jones. Official Court Reporter Donna Prather, Telephone number 276-628-5116 donnap@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 7/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#96

(#96) NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Joint Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#93

(#97) Financial arrangements made (Original) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #93 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 8/1/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jack Bondurant, Jr on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to extend TRO, to continue Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction Hearing and extending time to respond to plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/20/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to extend TRO, to continue Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction Hearing and extending time to respond to plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/20/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Mary Lou Prillaman, Criminal Investigator appointed. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/12/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#6

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Mary Lou Prillaman, Criminal Investigator appointed. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/12/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#4

(#4) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2018, reply due on or before 6/22/2018). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/11/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Larry Wayne Price, Jr, filed by United States Of America. #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lml). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

146 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Gustafson on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Gustafson, Ryan) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Admissions/Notice of Appearance due by 7/2/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) ORDER. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 6/2/2020. (EMH) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketRemark: case number assigned to transfer case USA v. Price, from the Western division of Virginia, is Montana case number CV-20-74-BLG-SPW. (EMH) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00027. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (EMH, ) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) Order transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Montana, Billings Division. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/1/2020. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) NOTICE by United States Of America (Frith, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motion Hearing held on June 10, 2019 before Honorable Judge James P. Jones. Official Court Reporter Donna Prather, Telephone number 276-628-5116 donnap@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 7/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Financial arrangements made (Original) (Ordinary-30 calendar days Service) re #93 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 8/1/2019. (dp) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) NOTICE by Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Joint Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Holt, Kevin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Michael Lugar on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Lugar, Justin) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jack Bondurant, Jr on behalf of Larry Wayne Price, Jr (Bondurant, Thomas) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Docket(#10) Notice Rescheduling Hearing (CR) (No Interpreter requested) previously set for 6/25/2018 at 9:00 AM before Judge James P. Jones in Abingdon. Show Cause Hearing and Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 7/2/2018 01:30 PM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to extend TRO, to continue Show Cause and Preliminary Injunction Hearing and extending time to respond to plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/20/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Extension by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Consiglio, Krista) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Mary Lou Prillaman, Criminal Investigator appointed. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/12/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appoint Temporary Receiver by United States Of America. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Hearing set for 6/25/2018 09:00 AM in Abingdon before Judge James P. Jones. Show Cause Response due by 6/20/2018, reply due on or before 6/22/2018). Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 6/11/2018. (lml) [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Larry Wayne Price, Jr, filed by United States Of America. #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lml). [Transferred from vawd on 6/2/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less