This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/06/2021 at 10:38:16 (UTC).

United States of America v. Dante Nicholson

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Dante Nicholson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark C. Scarsi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-11119

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Dante Nicholson

Garnishee

Antelope Valley Hospital District

1600 W Avenue J

Lancaster, CA 93534

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zoran Joseph Segina

Attorney at AUSA - US Attorney Office

300 North Los Angeles Street Room 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Brendan T. Mockler

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516Aa

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Dante Nicholson FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] #1 , Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 to Defendant by U.S. Mail served on 1/21/2021. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#9

(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brendan T. Mockler counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Brendan T. Mockler is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Mockler, Brendan) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 on Garnishee by Certified Mail served on 01/08/2021. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] issued. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#6

(#6) WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] issued. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] #1 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#4

(#4) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #2

Clerk's Notice

1 #1

Writ of Continuing Garnishment

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Dante Nicholson FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 Clerk's Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party United States of America(pty:pla)) (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Dante Nicholson FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] #1 , Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 to Defendant by U.S. Mail served on 1/21/2021. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brendan T. Mockler counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Brendan T. Mockler is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Mockler, Brendan) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America, re Order on Motion for Garnishment, #5 , Writ of Garnishment #6 on Garnishee by Certified Mail served on 01/08/2021. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S 28 U.S.C. 3202(b) NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT TO DEBTOR [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] issued. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] issued. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3205(c)(1)] AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] [ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT] #1 by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (lom) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Text Only Entry: This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:20-cv-11119-MCS. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment Dante Nicholson FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL DISTRICT [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] filed by PLAINTIFF United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Writ of Continuing Garnishment, #2 Clerk's Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party United States of America(pty:pla)) (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANTELOPE VALLEY HEALTHCARE DISTRICT DBA ANTELOPE VALLEY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zoran Joseph Segina

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brendan T Mockler