This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 08:24:40 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Nazir et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Nazir. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. McAvoy and Christian F. Hummel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00786

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

Arshad Nazir

Ticonderoga, NY 12883

Garnishee

Glens Falls National Bank & Trust Co.

250 Glen Street

Glens Falls, NY 12801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam J. Katz

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice - Albany Office

445 Broadway, Room 218, James T. Foley Courthouse

Albany, NY 12207-2924

Defendant Attorney

Cynthia E. Neidl

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP - Albany Office

54 State Street, 6Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Letter Motion from Cynthia E. Neidl for Arshad Nazir requesting Adjournment of Hearing submitted to Judge Hummel . (Neidl, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia E. Neidl on behalf of Arshad Nazir (Neidl, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#11

(#11) LETTER BRIEF United States Opposition to Defendants Exemption Claim and Hearing Request by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#10

(#10) EXEMPTION CLAIM(S) & REQUEST FOR A HEARING filed by Arshad Nazir. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #6 Notice (Other) as to Defendant and Third-Party (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #5 Writ of Garnishment service on Garnishee (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by Glens Falls National Bank & Trust Co.. Objections to Writ Answer due by 8/9/2021.(lmw) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Writ of Garnishment to Debtor and Exemptions Claim(s) and Request for Hearing. (lmw) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Application/Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

2 #1

Proposed Sealing Order

#2

(#2) Ex Parte Application to Seal Case filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealing Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (lmw) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Clerk's Notice of Writ

1 #1

Proposed Writ of Garnishment

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #2 Proposed Clerk's Notice of Writ, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmw) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER Appointing Pro Bono Counsel: At the conclusion of Pro Bono representation, counsel may access the fillable Pro Bono Fund Voucher Request for Reimbursement Form using the following link: http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/forms/ProBonoVoucherForm_mtdFILLABLE.pdf . Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/3/2021. (tab) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion from Cynthia E. Neidl for Arshad Nazir requesting Adjournment of Hearing submitted to Judge Hummel : The Writ of Garnishment Hearing scheduled for 9/8/2021 @ 11:00 AM is adjourned. A joint Status Report is directed and is due by 9/24/2021. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 9/3/2021. (tab) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Letter Motion from Cynthia E. Neidl for Arshad Nazir requesting Adjournment of Hearing submitted to Judge Hummel . (Neidl, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia E. Neidl on behalf of Arshad Nazir (Neidl, Cynthia) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing: The Writ of garnishment Hearing has been set for 9/8/2021 @ 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (tab)(Notice mailed to Defendant Arshad Nazir on 8/9/2021 via regular mail) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketText Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Writ Hearing held on 8/6/2021. Appearances by AUSA Adam Katz, for the government; Arshad Nazir, pro se. The Court inquires of Defendant Nazir of his intentions to retain counsel. Mr Nazir indicates that he has no funds to retain counsel but would like consult an attorney. The Court advises Mr. Nazir of the Pro Se Assistance Program and encourages deft to call the number and speak to counsel in regard to this matter. The Court adjourns the hearing until 9/8/2021 @ 11:00 am. A Court Notice will be issued for this hearing. (Court Reporter Lisa Tennyson) (tab) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER re #10 Letter Motion for Arshad Nazir requesting for a hearing filed by Arshad Nazir, and #11 LETTER BRIEF filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA : A Writ of Garnishment Hearing has been set for Friday, 8/6/2021 @ 10:30 AM in Albany. Defendant Nazir and Counsel for the government are directed to appear in Courtroom #3 on the 4th floor of the James T. Foley, US Courthouse located at 445 Broadway in Albany, NY. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/4/2021. (Copy served via regular mail and e-mail on Defendant Nazir, as well as by telephone communication, directly on 8/4/2021)(tab) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER BRIEF United States Opposition to Defendants Exemption Claim and Hearing Request by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXEMPTION CLAIM(S) & REQUEST FOR A HEARING filed by Arshad Nazir. (jel, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #6 Notice (Other) as to Defendant and Third-Party (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #5 Writ of Garnishment service on Garnishee (Katz, Adam) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: An Answer having been filed by the Garnishee Glens Falls National Bank & Trust Co. in the within action, this case is now unsealed as instructed by the #4 Sealing Order signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. (lmw) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by Glens Falls National Bank & Trust Co.. Objections to Writ Answer due by 8/9/2021.(lmw) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE of Writ of Garnishment to Debtor and Exemptions Claim(s) and Request for Hearing. (lmw) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued to Glens Falls National Bank & Trust Co. (lmw) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Application/Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/14/2021. (tab) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Ex Parte Application to Seal Case filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealing Order) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (lmw) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Writ of Garnishment, #2 Proposed Clerk's Notice of Writ, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lmw) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia E. Neidl