This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:24:56 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Mosqueda

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Mosqueda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-24184

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

Marcia Mosqueda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael N. Wilcove

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

555 4Th Street Nw, Po Box 14198 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (gie) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

5 #1

proposed consent judgment

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 12/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 proposed consent judgment)(Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Marcia Mosqueda. (drz) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Marcia Mosqueda. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT JUDGMENT. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (gie) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 12/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 proposed consent judgment)(Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Marcia Mosqueda. (drz) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Marcia Mosqueda. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wilcove, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less