This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 10:08:55 (UTC).

United States of America v. Mackenzie

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 United States of America filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Mackenzie. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominic W Lanza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02200

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dominic W Lanza

 

Party Details

Appellant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Debtors

Andrea C Carvalho

Michael A Leite

Appellees

ROBERT A MCKENZIE

Robert A Mackenzie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Edith Carmen Ramirez

Attorney at US Dept of Justice - Tax Division

P.O. Box 683 Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0683

Appellee Attorney

Terry A Dake

Attorney at Terry A Dake Ltd

20 E Thomas Rd., Ste. 2200

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3133

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Edith) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: PURSUANT to Local Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009-1, 8009-2, 8010-1, and FRPB 8009(a), the appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/17/20. (MAW) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

#1

(#1) Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Clerk US Bankruptcy Court (Phx). (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States' unopposed motion to extend the deadline for the United States' opening brief (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. The United States shall file its opening brief by January 19, 2021. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/29/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Edith) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SCHEDULING ORDER: PURSUANT to Local Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009-1, 8009-2, 8010-1, and FRPB 8009(a), the appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 12/17/20. (MAW) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Court by Clerk US Bankruptcy Court (Phx). (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, ) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edith Carmen Ramirez