This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:08:54 (UTC).

United States of America v. Mandustrial LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Mandustrial LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald B. Leighton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-05283

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald B. Leighton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Mandustrial, LLC

Ian Johnson

Federal Way, WA 98003

Mandustrial LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rika Valdman

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (TAX - BOX 683)

Po Box 683, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-0683

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction against All Defendants Attorney Rika Valdman added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mandustrial, LLC, #3 Summons Ian Johnson)(Valdman, Rika) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#4

(#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Ian Johnson on 4/23/2019 (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Permanent Injunction, filed by Ian Johnson (pro se). (GMR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons Ian Johnson

#2

(#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ian Johnson, Mandustrial LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MET) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

2 #1

Summons

1 #2

Summons Mandustrial, LLC

#3

(#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Mandustrial LLC on 4/20/2019 (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Permanent Injunction, filed by Ian Johnson (pro se). (GMR) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/21/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2019, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff United States of America re #3 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Ian Johnson on 4/23/2019 (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Mandustrial LLC on 4/20/2019 (Valdman, Rika) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Ian Johnson, Mandustrial LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MET) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (MET) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Permanent Injunction against All Defendants Attorney Rika Valdman added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Mandustrial, LLC, #3 Summons Ian Johnson)(Valdman, Rika) (No Fee Required) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less