This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:16:32 (UTC).

United States of America v. Maddox

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Maddox. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-MC-00089

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Petitioner

John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLc

Defendant

Ashley Maddox

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robin Tubesing, GOVT

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

2500 Tulare St., Suite 4401

Fresno, CA 93721

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) REQUEST for FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and ANSWER filed by Movant John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLc. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

7 #8

Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (blank for

7 #7

Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appea

7 #6

Instructions to Defendant/Judgment Debtor on How to Claim Exemptions; Claim for

7 #5

Ashley Maddoxs Request for Hearing (form)

7 #4

Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Objecting to the Answer of Garnishee

7 #3

Clerks Notice of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Writ of Continuing Garnishm

7 #2

Writ of Garnishment (issued)

7 #1

Application of Writ of Garnishment

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application of Writ of Garnishment, #2 Writ of Garnishment (issued), #3 Clerks Notice of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Writ of Continuing Garnishment (issued), #4 Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Objecting to the Answer of Garnishee, #5 Ashley Maddoxs Request for Hearing (form), #6 Instructions to Defendant/Judgment Debtor on How to Claim Exemptions; Claim for Exemption (form), #7 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeals Instructions, #8 Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (blank form))(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

6 #6

Consent or Decline Jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge (form)

6 #5

Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appea

6 #4

Instructions to Garnishee

6 #2

Writ of Garnishment (issued)

6 #1

Application for Writ of Garnishment

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Writ of Garnishment (issued), #3 Acknowledgment of Service and Answer of Garnishee (form), #4 Instructions to Garnishee, #5 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeal Instructions, #6 Consent or Decline Jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge (form))(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST for FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR FINAL ORDER OF GARNISHMENT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service and ANSWER filed by Movant John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLc. (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application of Writ of Garnishment, #2 Writ of Garnishment (issued), #3 Clerks Notice of Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Writ of Continuing Garnishment (issued), #4 Instructions to Judgment Debtor re Objecting to the Answer of Garnishee, #5 Ashley Maddoxs Request for Hearing (form), #6 Instructions to Defendant/Judgment Debtor on How to Claim Exemptions; Claim for Exemption (form), #7 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeals Instructions, #8 Consent to/Decline of Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge (blank form))(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment, #2 Writ of Garnishment (issued), #3 Acknowledgment of Service and Answer of Garnishee (form), #4 Instructions to Garnishee, #5 Notice of Availability of a Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction and Appeal Instructions, #6 Consent or Decline Jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge (form))(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WRIT of of Garnishment (Retired Accounts) ISSUED. (Rivera, O) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CLERK'S NOTICE of Instructions to Judgment Debtor RE Writ of Garnishment (Retirement Accounts). (Sant Agata, S) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST for PROPOSED CLERKS NOTICE OF INSTRUCTIONS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR RE: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT for Clerk's Signature and Issuance by United States of America. (Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT for Clerk's Issuance and Signature by United States of America. (Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNEW MISCELLANEOUS CASE FILED: Application for Writ of Garnishment. (Jessen, A) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment (John Hancock Retirement Plan Services, LLC) by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tubesing, Robin) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less