This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2021 at 00:42:37 (UTC).

United States of America v. Lowe et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 United States of America filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Lowe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John F. Heil, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Heil, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Petitioners

People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.

Carrie M. Leo

Walworth, NY 14568

Defendants

Jeffrey Lowe

Lauren Lowe

Tiger King, LLC

Greater Wynnewood Exotic Animal Park, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary Hollingsworth

Attorney at US Attorney (CO-Denver)

999 18Th St, S Terrace, Ste 370

Denver, CO 80202

Michael J. O'Malley

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

Robert M. Norway

Attorney at US Department of Justice (Environment & Natural Resources)

Po Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Briena Strippoli

Attorney at US Department of Justice (Federal Programs)

1100 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Susan S. Brandon

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

Devon Lea Flanagan

Attorney at US Department of Justice (Environment & Natural Resources)

Po Box 7611, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7611

Jonathan Brightbill

Attorney at Winston & Strawn, LLP (DC)

1901 L St Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Petitioner Attorneys

Mark E. Hornbeek

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Thomas G. Wolfe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Heather L. Hintz

Attorney at Phillips Murrah, PC

101 N Robinson, Ste 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel J. Card

Attorney at Daniel Card Law, LLC

512 Nw 12Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Jason D. May

Attorney at May Law Office

9 W Main St

Ardmore, OK 73401

 

Court Documents

#161

(#161) NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by United States of America (Flanagan, Devon) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

#160

(#160) MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) (Re: #100 MOTION for Costs ) by United States of America Responses due by 1/12/2022(Flanagan, Devon) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

100 #9

Exhibit 9: May 26, 2021 Email Correspondence with Dr. Fryer

100 #8

Exhibit 8: Acquisition Record for Three Cubs

100 #5

Exhibit 5: Hogan Time Sheets

100 #4

Exhibit 4: Flanagan Time Sheets

100 #3

Exhibit 3: Strippoli Time Sheets

100 #1

Exhibit 1: Hollingsworth Declaration

#100

(#156) ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III approving #155 Consent Decree. The United States shall move to dismiss all counts of the Complaint in this action against the Lowes no later than 1/6/2022, and shall move to withdraw its pending #100 Motion for Costs no later than 1/6/2022. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - July 8, 2020 USDA Inspection Report

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - June 22, 2020 USDA Inspection Report

#2

#1

317 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#161) NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by United States of America (Flanagan, Devon) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#160) MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) (Re: #100 MOTION for Costs ) by United States of America Responses due by 1/12/2022(Flanagan, Devon) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***Remark: Per request of the 10th Circuit Court of Appeals, exhibit DVD's copied and mailed by certified mail, USPS tracking number 7020 2450 0000 4758 9597. Re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File, #29 MOTION for Leave to File, #26 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Leave to File Exhibit Conventionally ) (jls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#159) USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal in USCA Case Number 21-7058 (Re: #150 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory ) (jls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#158) DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Greater Wynnewood Exotic Animal Park, LLC and Tiger King, LLC. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#157) OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III granting #143 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants by United States of America. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#156) ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III approving #155 Consent Decree. The United States shall move to dismiss all counts of the Complaint in this action against the Lowes no later than 1/6/2022, and shall move to withdraw its pending #100 Motion for Costs no later than 1/6/2022. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#155) Consent Decree as to Jeffrey and Lauren Lowe by United States of America (Strippoli, Briena) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#154) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge John F. Heil, III STRIKING #149 Joint STIPULATION Consent Decree as to Jeffrey and Lauren Lowe by United States of America. Parties are directed to submit a proposed order to the Court's intake at CM-ECFIntake_oked@oked.uscourts.gov (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) NOTICE Regarding Consent Decree, Motion for Default Judgment, and Correspondence from Clayton Hughes about Skunks by United States of America (With attachments)(Strippoli, Briena) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
142 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) by United States of America ; (With attachments)(Hollingsworth, Mary) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States of America Responses due by 12/9/2020(Hollingsworth, Mary) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Briena Strippoli on behalf of United States of America (Strippoli, Briena) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Tiger King, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Greater Wynnewood Exotic Animal Park, LLC (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Lauren Lowe (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jeffrey Lowe (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Greater Wynnewood Exotic Animal Park, LLC, Jeffrey Lowe, Lauren Lowe, Tiger King, LLC by United States of America (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States of America (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEOPLE FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather L. Hintz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark E Hornbeek

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Gilmer Wolfe