This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2019 at 07:41:15 (UTC).

United States of America v. Lookabaugh

Case Summary

On 02/25/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Lookabaugh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amanda Arnold Sansone and Mary S. Scriven. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-MC-00020

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

Presiding Judge

Mary S. Scriven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

United States of America

Respondent

Kelli Lookabaugh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Joseph Michael Tompkins

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM*

Suite 3200, 400 N Tampa St

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ORDER to show cause. A show-cause hearing is scheduled for June 12, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/27/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Griffin, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/24/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Amy L. Ham by United States of America. (JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/24/2019. (GMD) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE cancelling show-cause hearing scheduled for June 12, 2019. (DMP) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by United States of America (Griffin, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER to show cause. A show-cause hearing is scheduled for June 12, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 3/27/2019. (DMP) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DECLARATION of Amy L. Ham by United States of America. (JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.