This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 06:03:44 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Limetree Bay Refining, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other - Environment lawsuit against Limetree Bay Refining, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and George W. Cannon, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Environment

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

George W. Cannon, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Washington, DC 20044

Defendants

Limetree Bay Refining, LLC

Washington Square, Suite 1100, 1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC

Washington Square, Suite 1100, 1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw

Washingotn, DC 20036

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Myles E Flint

Attorney at U.S Department of Justice, Environmental Enforcement Section

601 D. Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STATUS REPORT Fourth Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER (GWC) dated 2/18/2022 granting #12 Third Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; extending stay through 5/20/2022; ordering status report by 4/20/2022 (KMD) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#11

(#11) STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER (GWC) dated 12/10/2021 granting #9 Second Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; staying all deadlines and proceedings through 2/21/2022; ordering a joint status report by 1/21/2022 (KMD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#7

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

2 #2

Exhibit

#2

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS REPORT Fourth Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER (GWC) dated 2/18/2022 granting #12 Third Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; extending stay through 5/20/2022; ordering status report by 4/20/2022 (KMD) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT Third Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (GWC) dated 12/10/2021 granting #9 Second Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; staying all deadlines and proceedings through 2/21/2022; ordering a joint status report by 1/21/2022 (KMD) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STATUS REPORT Second Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER EXTENDING STAY (GWC) dated 9/10/2021 granting #6 Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines; extending stay through 12/10/2021. Status report due by 11/12/2021. (KMD) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (GWC) dated 8/26/2021 granting #3 Unopposed Motion to Stay All Deadlines. Matter is STAYED through 10/11/2021. Joint status report due by 9/10/2021. (KMD) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay all deadlines by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STIPULATION Joint Stipulation by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Flint, Myles) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Limetree Bay Terminals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Limetree Bay Refining, LLC is a litigant