This case was last updated from PACER on 09/30/2019 at 08:32:31 (UTC).

United States of America v. Lancor et al

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Lancor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda K. Sannes and Therese Wiley Dancks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00936

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brenda K. Sannes

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Marion Lancor

XYZ Corporation

Marion B. Lancor

Northern Federal Credit Union

John Doe

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole B. LaBletta

Attorney at Pincus Law Group, PLLC - Nassau Office

425 Rxr Plaza

Uniondale, NY 11556

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Marion Lancor served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT - Action to Foreclose a Mortgage against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., John Doe, Marion Lancor, Northern Federal Credit Union, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

2 #1

Summons for Northern Federal Credit Union

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Marion Lancor, and Northern Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Northern Federal Credit Union, #2 Summons for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.)(see) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

2 #2

Summons for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019; Northern Federal Credit Union served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed Dkt. No. #7 . If defendant Lancor does not respond to the complaint or otherwise appear in this action by 10/4/2019, Plaintiff should file request for Clerk's Entry of Default thereafter regarding all defendants, if appropriate. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/17/2019. (sg) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Marion Lancor served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket and notes that answer deadlines as to defendants Capital One Bank and Northern Federal Credit Union have passed, with no answer filed or appearance made on behalf of either defendant. Court also notes no affidavit of service has yet been filed as to defendant Lancor. Plaintiff to file status report re: any communications plaintiff has had with defendants Capital One Bank and Northern Federal Credit Union or request for entry of default as to those two defendants by 9/20/2019. Plaintiff to include in that status report the status of service on defendant Lancor. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/11/2019. (sg) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019; Northern Federal Credit Union served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary roe, and XYZ Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Marion Lancor, and Northern Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Northern Federal Credit Union, #2 Summons for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.)(see) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT - Action to Foreclose a Mortgage against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., John Doe, Marion Lancor, Northern Federal Credit Union, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.