This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 10:20:24 (UTC).

United States of America v. Lamonne Doinae Wesley

Case Summary

On 04/26/2019 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Lamonne Doinae Wesley. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Manuel L. Real. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-03430

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,

United States of America

Defendant

LAMONNE DOINAE WESLEY

Garnishee

Futuredontics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Louisa O Kirakosian

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #6 , Order,,, Terminated Case,, #5 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #4 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 6/17/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER of Garnishee to Writ of Continuing Garnishment filed by Garnishee Futuredontics Inc. (gk) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #6 , Order,,, Terminated Case,, #5 SERVICE ON GARNISHEE BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 5/31/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT issued to Debtor as to Futuredontics, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued against the funds, assets, and/or property of defendant/judgment debtor Lamonne Doinae Wesley as to Futuredontics, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Plaintiff's Application #1 , the Court ORDERS that: (1) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of continuing garnishment with respect to Garnishee(s) Futuredontics, Inc.; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Lamonne Doinae Wesley by signing the forms submitted by the United States. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Order

1 #2

CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR

1 #1

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

#1

(#1) APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE FUTUREDONTICS, INC. [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Louisa O Kirakosian added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #6 , Order,,, Terminated Case,, #5 , Notice of Continuing Garnishment #7 , Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #4 SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BY U.S. MAIL served on 6/17/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER of Garnishee to Writ of Continuing Garnishment filed by Garnishee Futuredontics Inc. (gk) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff United States of America, re Writ of Garnishment #6 , Order,,, Terminated Case,, #5 SERVICE ON GARNISHEE BY CERTIFIED MAIL served on 5/31/2019. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT issued to Debtor as to Futuredontics, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued against the funds, assets, and/or property of defendant/judgment debtor Lamonne Doinae Wesley as to Futuredontics, Inc. (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO ISSUE WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT AND ORDER TO ISSUE CLERK'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING POSTJUDGMENT GARNISHMENT by Judge Manuel L. Real: Upon Plaintiff's Application #1 , the Court ORDERS that: (1) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a writ of continuing garnishment with respect to Garnishee(s) Futuredontics, Inc.; and (2) The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Clerk's Notice of Continuing Postjudgment Garnishment to Lamonne Doinae Wesley by signing the forms submitted by the United States. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • (#3) This case has been assigned to United States District Judge Manuel L. Real. The case number on all documents filed with the Court should read 2:19-cv-03430-R. Please refer to the assigned judge's Procedures and Schedules, available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov/judges-requirements, for additional information. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT TO GARNISHEE FUTUREDONTICS, INC. [28 U.S.C. 3205(b)] AND CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR [28 U.S.C. 3202(b)] No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attachments: #1 WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT, #2 CLERKS NOTICE OF ENFORCEMENT TO DEBTOR, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Louisa O Kirakosian added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Kirakosian, Louisa) (Entered: 04/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FutureDontics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Louisa O Kirakosian