This case was last updated from PACER on 08/05/2019 at 07:36:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. Katz et al

Case Summary

On 06/06/2019 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Katz. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie Dawkins Davis and Matthew F. Leitman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-11684

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie Dawkins Davis

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Leitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

David Martin Katz

Scott Phillip Zack

Interested Parties

Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC

UHG Boca, LLC

Joseph F. DeSanto

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark S. McDonald

Attorney at U. S. Department of Justice

P O Box 972, Ben Frankliin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Fishman

615 Griswold, Suite 1125

Detroit, MI 48226

Ben M. Gonek

Attorney at Law Offices of Ben M. Gonek, PLLC

500 Griswold Street, Suite 2450

Detroit, MI 48226

Christopher A. Andreoff

Attorney at Jaffe, Raitt,

27777 Franklin Road, Suite 2500

Southfield, MI 48034-8214

Interested Party Attorneys

David H. Fink

Attorney at Fink Associates Law

38500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 350

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Lindsay D Long

Attorney at Fink Bressack

38500 Woodward Ave., Suite 350

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

Nathan J. Fink

Attorney at Fink Associates Law

38500 Woodward Ave, Suite 350

Bloomfield Hills, MI 48304

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER Granting Non-Parties' #1 Motion for Clarification or Modification of Defendants Katz and Zack's Order Setting Conditions of Release and Closing Action. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#15

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF HEARING on #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. CONTINUED Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE from Miscellaneous Docket to Civil Docket [Old Miscellaneous Number: 19-50562] Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF HEARING on #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Receipt No: 0645-7196320 - Fee: 47 dollars filed by United States of America. (McDonald, Mark) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #5 Response to Motion, filed by David Martin Katz by Scott Phillip Zack (Gonek, Ben) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Motion that Initiates a Miscellaneous Case. Response due by 5/1/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#5

(#7) NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #5 Response to Motion, filed by David Martin Katz by Scott Phillip Zack (Gonek, Ben) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Fink, Nathan) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay D Long on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Long, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2019 re #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **Counsel for the Government and Defendants are Required to Participate. The Court will Initiate the Call**) Disposition: Hearing Continued. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SEALED TRANSCRIPT of IN CAMERA TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on June 5, 2019. (Court Reporter: Peg L. Goodrich) (Number of Pages: 20) Attorneys of record may purchase a copy of the transcript from the Court Reporter. (Goodrich, P) (Entered: 07/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) TRANSCRIPT of NON-PARTIES' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR MODIFICATION OF DEFENDANTS KATZ AND ZACK'S ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE held on 06/03/2019. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 47) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TRANSCRIPT of Non-Parties' Motion for Clarification or Modification of Defendants Katz and Zack's Order Setting Conditions of Release held on 07-01-2019. (Court Reporter/Transcriber: Robert L. Smith) (Number of Pages: 25) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Reporter/Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 8/13/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2019. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (Smith, R.) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Granting Non-Parties' #1 Motion for Clarification or Modification of Defendants Katz and Zack's Order Setting Conditions of Release and Closing Action. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2019 re #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Disposition: Motion Granted. Order to Follow. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Motion Hearing RESET for 7/1/2019 at 1:00 PM (**IN DETROIT - COURTROOM 111**) before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF HEARING on #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. CONTINUED Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2019 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE from Miscellaneous Docket to Civil Docket [Old Miscellaneous Number: 19-50562] Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (SSch) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: In Camera Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/5/2019. (Court Reporter: Peg Goodrich) (HMon) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman: Motion Hearing held on 6/3/2019 re #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. (TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. **Counsel for the Government and Defendants are Required to Participate. The Court will Initiate the Call**) Disposition: Hearing Continued. (Court Reporter: Rob Smith) (HMon) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF HEARING on #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2019 at 1:30 PM before District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Receipt No: 0645-7196320 - Fee: 47 dollars filed by United States of America. (McDonald, Mark) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Joinder/Concurrence in #5 Response to Motion, filed by David Martin Katz by Scott Phillip Zack (Gonek, Ben) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Requiring Response to #1 Motion that Initiates a Miscellaneous Case. Response due by 5/1/2019. Signed by District Judge Matthew F. Leitman. (HMon) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to #1 INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Receipt No: 0645-7196320 - Fee: 47 dollars filed by David Martin Katz. (Fishman, Steven) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan J. Fink on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Fink, Nathan) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Fink on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Fink, David) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay D Long on behalf of Joseph F. DeSanto, Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC. (Long, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) INITIATING MOTION Clarification or Modification of Bond Conditions by Professional Holdings Unlimited, LLC, UHG Boca, LLC, Joseph F. DeSanto. Receipt No: 0645-7196320 - Fee: 47 dollars (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Long, Lindsay) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • [RELATED to criminal case # 18-20368 Dft 1&2] (DWor) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less