This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:29:55 (UTC).

United States of America v. Jackson

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles C. Lovell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles C. Lovell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Kyle S. Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A. Kakuk

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - HELENA

901 Front Street, Suite 1100

Helena, MT 59626

Defendant Attorney

Palmer A. Hoovestal

Attorney at HOOVESTAL LAW FIRM

Po Box 747

Helena, MT 59624-0747

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Order Setting: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Charles C. Lovell.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/17/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/17/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/17/2020. Please review complete order for additional deadlines and requirements. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 6/4/2020. (DED) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle S. Jackson. (Hoovestal, Palmer) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kyle S. Jackson waiver sent on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Kakuk, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kyle S. Jackson on 4/8/2020 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Kakuk, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Kyle S. Jackson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting: Initial Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Helena, MT before Judge Charles C. Lovell.Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/17/2020. Joint Discovery Plan due by 9/17/2020. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 9/17/2020. Please review complete order for additional deadlines and requirements. Signed by Judge Charles C. Lovell on 6/4/2020. (DED) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Kyle S. Jackson. (Hoovestal, Palmer) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kyle S. Jackson waiver sent on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Kakuk, Michael) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kyle S. Jackson on 4/8/2020 by United States of America. Waiver of Service due by 5/8/2020. (Kakuk, Michael) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Kyle S. Jackson, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HEG) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less