This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 08:23:52 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Hughes et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Hughes. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert W. Schroeder, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert W. Schroeder, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

Robert Clayton Strayhan

Jason Neil Hughes

Aimee Monette Hughes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Austin Wells

Attorney at U S Attorney's Office - Tyler

110 N. College, Ste 700

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Fletcher Rommel

Attorney at Wyly-Rommel, PLLC

4004 Texas Blvd.

Texarkana, TX 75503

Eric G. Hughes

Attorney at Hughes & Hughes Law Firm

310 Clay Street, P O. Box 536

Arkadelphia, AR 71923

Eric Glen Hughes

Attorney at Hughes & Hughes Law Firm

310 Clay Street, P O. Box 536

Arkadelphia, AR 71923

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) AMENDED ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/29/2019. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER. ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/29/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

25 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#25

(#25) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes (Hughes, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robert Clayton Strayhan Notice of Initial Disclosures (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Clayton Strayhan.(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/10/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Jason Neil Hughes. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Clayton Strayhan. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#8) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.), Motions terminated: Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

2 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#20) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Clayton Strayhan.(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/10/2019)

1 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#7) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint and all documents related to the request for injunctive relief. It hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that theMotion to Seal the Complaint and all documents related to the request forinjunctive relief, including this motion (Docket No. 1) and Order, besealed until personal service has been perfected.Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) AMENDED ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/29/2019. (slo, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER. ( Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2019 10:15 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/29/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes (Hughes, Eric) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Wells, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Robert Clayton Strayhan Notice of Initial Disclosures (Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Robert Clayton Strayhan.(Rommel, Sean) (Entered: 08/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER re: #16 Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal of Defendant ChangePoint Counseling Services, PLLC ("ChangePoint"). The Court, having considered the notice, is of the opinion that the allegations against ChangePoint should be DISMISSED. It is therefore ORDERED that any and all claims for relief against Defendant ChangePoint are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/06/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Robert Clayton Strayhan to 8/20/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( lfs, ) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric G. Hughes for Aimee Monette Hughes, Jason Neil Hughes. Filing fee $ 100 paid (RECEIPT # TXE 100018924). (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.), Motions terminated: Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #1 Motion to Seal Complaint and all documents related to the request for injunctive relief. It hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that theMotion to Seal the Complaint and all documents related to the request forinjunctive relief, including this motion (Docket No. 1) and Order, besealed until personal service has been perfected.Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/12/19. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Aimee Monette Hughes. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Jason Neil Hughes. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Robert Clayton Strayhan. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and Other Equitable Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Seal the Complaint and all documents related to Request for Injunctive Relief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(lfs, ) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less