This case was last updated from PACER on 04/07/2019 at 07:33:02 (UTC).

United States of America v. Griffith et al

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Griffith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kirtan Khalsa and Jerry H. Ritter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00098

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kirtan Khalsa

Presiding Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust

Betty Lois Griffith

Jack D. Griffith

San Juan County Treasurer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas M. Herrin

Attorney at USDOJ

717 N. Harwood, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorney

Joseph Foye Sawyer

Attorney at San Juan County

100 S. Oliver Drive

Aztec, NM 87410

 

Court Documents

2 #2

Supplement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#2

(#2) ***FILED IN ERROR***APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Issuance of Summonses to Defendants by United States of America (IRS) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Herrin, Thomas) Modified on 2/6/2019 pursuant to atty request to indicate filed in error; atty will file summons return(s) at a later time(mnb). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

2 #3

Supplement

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to meet and confer by 3/12/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 3/25/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/28/2019. (kmt) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. San Juan County Treasurer served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by San Juan County Treasurer. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Sawyer, Joseph) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

2 #1

Supplement

11 #1

Exhibit 1 Declaration with attachments

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jack D. Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by United States of America Notice to Court Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 3091 Notice of Chapter 13 Bankrupcty Case) (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty Lois Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • (#13) ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. In light of Plaintiff's Notice to Court Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith (Doc. 12), the Court's Initial Scheduling Order (Doc. 10) and all associated hearings and deadlines as set forth therein are hereby VACATED. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (kmt) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by United States of America Notice to Court Regarding Bankruptcy Filing by Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Form 3091 Notice of Chapter 13 Bankrupcty Case) (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 03/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by United States of America Request to Clerk for Entry of Default against Defendants Jack D. and Betty Lois Griffith, and the JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration with attachments, #2 proposed Clerk's Entry of Default) (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to meet and confer by 3/12/2019. The parties' Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan is due by 3/25/2019. A Telephonic Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference is set for 4/2/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Khalsa. Counsel and pro se parties are to call Judge Khalsa's AT&T Conference Line at (877) 848-7030 and enter the Code 7324132 to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 3/28/2019. (kmt) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by San Juan County Treasurer. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by United States of America.(Sawyer, Joseph) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. San Juan County Treasurer served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty Lois Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Jack D. Griffith served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. JD Griffith & Betty Lois Griffith Living Trust served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. (Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mnb) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • (#3) ***FILED IN ERROR***PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mnb) Modified on 2/6/2019 to indicate filed in error(mnb). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (mnb) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ***FILED IN ERROR***APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Issuance of Summonses to Defendants by United States of America (IRS) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement) (Herrin, Thomas) Modified on 2/6/2019 pursuant to atty request to indicate filed in error; atty will file summons return(s) at a later time(mnb). (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Waived), filed by United States of America (IRS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrin, Thomas) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.