This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:32:51 (UTC).

United States of America v. Goldsmith

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Goldsmith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez and Karen S. Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger T. Benitez

Referral Judge

Karen S. Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Robert Goldsmith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James J. Petrila

555 4Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Nithya Senra

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

P.O. Box 683

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

Lindsey B. Wagner

Attorney at Scott Wagner and Associates, P.A.

3500 W. Olive Ave., Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nithya Senra on behalf of United States of America (Senra, Nithya)Attorney Nithya Senra added to party United States of America(pty:pla) (mme). (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey B. Wagner on behalf of Robert Goldsmith (Wagner, Lindsey)Attorney Lindsey B. Wagner added to party Robert Goldsmith(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Goldsmith, Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-00087-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Petrila, James)(jxv) (sjt). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Goldsmith, filed by United States of America. (Petrila, James) (mme). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America, as to Robert Goldsmith. (Senra, Nithya) (mme). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey B. Wagner on behalf of Robert Goldsmith (Wagner, Lindsey)Attorney Lindsey B. Wagner added to party Robert Goldsmith(pty:dft) (tcf). (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Nithya Senra on behalf of United States of America (Senra, Nithya)Attorney Nithya Senra added to party United States of America(pty:pla) (mme). (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America, as to Robert Goldsmith. (Senra, Nithya) (mme). (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert Goldsmith, filed by United States of America. (Petrila, James) (mme). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Goldsmith, Fee Waived, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-00087-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Petrila, James)(jxv) (sjt). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.