This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/29/2021 at 09:56:14 (UTC).

United States of America v. Global Paratransit, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Global Paratransit, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo A. Rocconi and Fernando M. Olguin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02744

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

Global Paratransit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zoran Joseph Segina

Attorney at AUSA - US Attorney Office

300 North Los Angeles Street Room 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, upon Defendant Global Paratransit, Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Neil Evans, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Global Paratransit, Inc. (car) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (car) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney Zoran Joseph Segina added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Segina, Zoran) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GLOBAL PARATRANSIT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zoran Joseph Segina