This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:14:16 (UTC).

United States of America v. Gabbert et al

Case Summary

On 04/22/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Gabbert. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jonathan E. Hawley and Joe Billy McDade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01138

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jonathan E. Hawley

Presiding Judge

Joe Billy McDade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Randel A. Gabbert

Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc.

Joann M. Gabbert

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert Joseph Wille

Attorney at US DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 55

Washington, DC 20044

Defendant Attorney

William W P Atkins

Attorney at JOHNSON BUNCE & NOBLE PC

7800 N Sommer St

Peoria, IL 61615

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc..(Atkins, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W P Atkins on behalf of Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Joann Gabbert Summons

#7

(#7) TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/26/2019 at 10:15 AMvia telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 7/23/19. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/2019. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

1 #2

Randel Gabbert Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Gabbert & Son Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Randel Gabbert Summons, #3 Joann Gabbert Summons, #4 Gabbert & Son Summons)(Wille, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER: This case is set for a Rule 16 scheduling conference before Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/26/2019 at 10:15 AMvia telephone (Court to set up the call). If Counsel are to be reached at a number different than what is listed on the docket sheet, they are directed to phone Judge Hawley's courtroom deputy at 309-671-7117 and confirm the phone number where they may be reached for the call. A discovery plan pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3) shall be filed on or before 7/23/19. The parties may, but are not required to, follow the format of the sample discovery plan set forth as Attachment A to the standing order attached to this text order. The Discovery Plan event may be found in the CM/ECF system within the other Documents category. All counsel must read and be familiar with the standing order attached to this text order prior to their Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 6/25/2019. (WG, ilcd) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc..(Atkins, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William W P Atkins on behalf of Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Return of Service Executed by United States of America as to Joann M. Gabbert 6/7/2019. (Wille, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Randel A. Gabbert served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. (Wille, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Joann M. Gabbert, Randel A. Gabbert, Gabbert & Son Cleaning Services, Inc. (VH, ilcd) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Randel Gabbert Summons, #3 Joann Gabbert Summons, #4 Gabbert & Son Summons)(Wille, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.