This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 08:54:40 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against FRANCIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00372

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

SUGUM FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY E. EILER

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

100 Middle Street Plaza

Portland, ME 04101

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. SUGUM FRANCIS served on 11/24/2020. (EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to SUGUM FRANCIS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mlm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

1 #9

Exhibit I - Notice of Penalty 2020010330000101

1 #8

Exhibit H - Notice of Penalty 202001033000201

1 #7

Exhibit G - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000901

1 #6

Exhibit F - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000801

1 #5

Exhibit E - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000701

1 #4

Exhibit D - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000501

1 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000101

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000201

1 #1

Exhibit A - October 2018 Warning Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SUGUM FRANCIS, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/11/2021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 2018 Warning Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000201, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000101, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000501, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000701, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000801, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000901, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Penalty 202001033000201, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of Penalty 2020010330000101)(bfa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline Regarding #4 Summons Returned Executed for SUGUM FRANCIS: Answer due by 12/15/2020. (jgd) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. SUGUM FRANCIS served on 11/24/2020. (EILER, ASHLEY) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SUGUM FRANCIS. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (mlm) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SUGUM FRANCIS, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Service of Process Deadline 1/11/2021) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - October 2018 Warning Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000201, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000101, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000501, #5 Exhibit E - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000701, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000801, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Penalty 2019010330000901, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Penalty 202001033000201, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of Penalty 2020010330000101)(bfa) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less