This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2019 at 08:04:29 (UTC).

United States of America v. Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents 40,530 00. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sandra J. Feuerstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00801

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sandra J. Feuerstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Diane C. Leonardo

Attorney at Assistant United States Attorney

610 Federal Plaza

Central Islip, NY 11722

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Joseph Cassar

Attorney at Christopher J. Cassar P.C.

13 East Carver Street

Huntington, NY 11743

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Cassar on behalf of Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) (notification declined or already on case) (Cassar, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#3

(#3) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN re: #2 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM returned executed by the U.S. Marshals Service for Richard P. Donoghue-USA, Eastern District of New York 610 Federal Plaza 5th Floor Central Islip, N.Y. 11722 Attn: Brian Gappa; Special Instructions: Please arrange to execute the warrant in rem and transfer the United States currency to a Judicial action. Return receipt Requested. 18-DEA-643269. Date of Service: February 28, 2019; Remarks: $40,530.00 transferred to Judicial action on February 28, 2019. (Cubano, Jazmin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#6

(#6) CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00). (Cassar, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#2

(#2) WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM - YOU ARE THEREFORE HEREBY COMMANDED to arrest and seize the Defendant Funds and use discretion and whatever means appropriate to protect and maintain the Defendant Funds; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office ("USAO"), the USMS and/or the DEA, or their authorized agents, representatives and/or contractors shall serve upon all potential claimants to the Defendant Funds a copy of this Warrant and the Verified Complaint In Rem in a manner consistent with the principles of service of process of an action in rem under the Supplemental Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and publish notice of this action on the government website, www.forfeiture.gov, in accordance with the customs and practice of this district, pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(4); and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a return of this Warrant shall be promptly made to the Court identifying the individuals upon whom copies were served and the manner employed. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/13/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLAIM Opposing Forfeiture by Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00). (Cassar, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Joseph Cassar on behalf of Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) (notification declined or already on case) (Cassar, Christopher) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN re: #2 WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM returned executed by the U.S. Marshals Service for Richard P. Donoghue-USA, Eastern District of New York 610 Federal Plaza 5th Floor Central Islip, N.Y. 11722 Attn: Brian Gappa; Special Instructions: Please arrange to execute the warrant in rem and transfer the United States currency to a Judicial action. Return receipt Requested. 18-DEA-643269. Date of Service: February 28, 2019; Remarks: $40,530.00 transferred to Judicial action on February 28, 2019. (Cubano, Jazmin) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WARRANT FOR ARREST OF ARTICLES IN REM - YOU ARE THEREFORE HEREBY COMMANDED to arrest and seize the Defendant Funds and use discretion and whatever means appropriate to protect and maintain the Defendant Funds; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Attorney's Office ("USAO"), the USMS and/or the DEA, or their authorized agents, representatives and/or contractors shall serve upon all potential claimants to the Defendant Funds a copy of this Warrant and the Verified Complaint In Rem in a manner consistent with the principles of service of process of an action in rem under the Supplemental Rules, and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and publish notice of this action on the government website, www.forfeiture.gov, in accordance with the customs and practice of this district, pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(4); and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a return of this Warrant shall be promptly made to the Court identifying the individuals upon whom copies were served and the manner employed. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/13/2019. (Tirado, Chelsea) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 6/11/2019 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon all potential claimants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Adell, April) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Forty Thousand Five Hundred Thirty Dollars and Zero Cents ($40,530.00) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cox, Dwayne) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.