This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 08:06:10 (UTC).

United States of America v. Fleming

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Fleming. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01109

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

United States of America

USA

Defendant

James A Fleming

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ali Gadelhak

Attorney at United States Department of Justice

555 4Th Street, Nw, Room 8636

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to James A Fleming. Original mailed to Attorney Ali Gadelhak. (tba) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Gadelhak on behalf of USA (Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1109-RJD. Consent due by 11/12/2020 (tba) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Requested. (Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against James A Fleming, filed by United States of America.(Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge David W. Dugan for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1109-DWD. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re 8 Notice (Other) filed by USA. Filer used incorrect event when docketing. For future reference please use the docketing event > Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents> Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Document has been modified to the correct event. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #2 Summons Requested, #5 Notice of Appearance filed by USA. The notice of appearance and submitted summons are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only and therefore no action is required. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to James A Fleming. Original mailed to Attorney Ali Gadelhak. (tba) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ali Gadelhak on behalf of USA (Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ACTION. See Local Rule 83.1(f). In all cases filed in, removed to, ortransferred to this court, all attorneys, including government attorneys, shall file a written entry of appearance before addressing the court. Attorney Gadelhak does not have a Notice of Appearance on file in this case. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: USA. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-1109-RJD. Consent due by 11/12/2020 (tba) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Requested. (Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against James A Fleming, filed by United States of America.(Gadelhak, Ali) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less