This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:22:14 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FACEBOOK, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against FACEBOOK, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02184

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Intervenors and Petitioners

ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER

LEONID GOLDSTEIN

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant

FACEBOOK, INC.

Amicus Curiae

CENTER FOR THE LEGALIZATION OF PRIVACY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa K. Hsiao

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th Street, Nw, Suite 6400-South

Washington, DC 20001

Patrick Raymond Runkle

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th St., Nw, Suite 6400

Washington, DC 20001

Jason Lee

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 5Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Intervenor and Petitioner Attorney

Alan Jay Butler

Attorney at ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER

1519 New Hampshire Ave, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Olivia Arden Adendorff

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

2100 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1100

Dallas, TX 75201

Orin Samuel Snyder

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Joshua S. Lipshutz

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, Nw, 9Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Thomas G. Hungar

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER, LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, Nw, 9Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

Stephen R. Klein

Attorney at STATECRAFT PLLC

1629 K Street Nw, Suite 300

Washington, DC 20006

Amy Lynn Peikoff

3024 E. Chapman Avenue, #129

Orange, CA 92869

 

Court Documents

18 #2

Text of Proposed Order granting pro hac vice admission

18 #1

Declaration of Amy Lynn Peikoff

#18

17 #1

Text of Proposed Order for Leave to File

#17

#16

#15

#14

5 #3

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Proposed Stipulated Order for Civil Penalty, Monetary Judgment, and Injunctive

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting Amicus Curiae's #18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amy Lynn Peikoff is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/12/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting, for good cause shown, the #17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the amicus curiae brief shall be filed by October 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 9/12/2019. (lctjk1) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amy Lynn Peikoff, :Firm- Center for the Legalization of Privacy, :Address- 3024 E. Chapman Ave. #129, Orange CA 92869. Phone No. - 714-409-8275. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6373347. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Center for the Legalization of Privacy (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Lynn Peikoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order granting pro hac vice admission)(Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by Center for the Legalization of Privacy (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Leave to File)(Klein, Stephen) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Raymond Runkle on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Runkle, Patrick) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Intervene by LEONID GOLDSTEIN. (ztth) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Lee on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REPLY to opposition to motion re #5 MOTION to Intervene or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief MOTION for Briefing Schedule to hear from intervenors and interested parties MOTION for Hearing on parties' motion to approve consent judgment filed by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint in Intervention)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Intervene or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief MOTION for Briefing Schedule to hear from intervenors and interested parties MOTION for Hearing on parties' motion to approve consent judgment filed by FACEBOOK, INC.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Memorandum in opposition to re #5 MOTION to Intervene or, in the alternative MOTION for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief MOTION for Briefing Schedule to hear from intervenors and interested parties MOTION for Hearing on parties' motion to approve consent judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hsiao, Lisa) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FACEBOOK, INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC. (Hungar, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Lipshutz on behalf of FACEBOOK, INC. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Intervene or, in the alternative, MOTION for Leave to File an amicus curiae brief, MOTION for Briefing Schedule to hear from intervenors and interested parties, MOTION for Hearing on parties' motion to approve consent judgment by ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10)(Butler, Alan) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • SUMMONS Not Issued as to FACEBOOK, INC. (zeg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zeg) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ERRATA re #2 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order for Civil Penalty, Monetary Judgment, and Injunctive Relief)(Hsiao, Lisa) Modified to add link on 7/26/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ERRATA Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsiao, Lisa) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Consent MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order for Civil Penalty, Monetary Judgment, and Injunctive Relief)(Hsiao, Lisa) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK, INC. (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hsiao, Lisa) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELECTRONIC PRIVACY INFORMATION CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen Ralph Klein