United States Of America v. Envigo RMS, LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Envigo RMS, LLC, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 2021 Inspection Report _ Part 1, #2 Exhibit B - July 2021 Inspection Report _ Part 2, #3 Exhibit C - October 2021 Inspection Report, #4 Exhibit D - November 2021 Inspection Report, #5 Exhibit E - March 2022 Inspection Report, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - July 2021 Inspection Report Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - July 2021 Inspection Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - October 2021 Inspection Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - November 2021 Inspection Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - March 2022 Inspection Report, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - May 16, 2022 Necropsy Report, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G - Declaration of Dr. Moffitt, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H - Declaration of Mary Hollingsworth, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I - Declaration of Amy Taylor, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J - May 18, 2022 Veterinary Treatment Forms)(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; granting #2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by United States Of America. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on May 21, 2022. (ca) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Clarification re #3 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary) Modified docket text on 5/21/2022 (ca).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORAL ORDER: Upon review of the Government's motion for clarification at Dkt. #4 , the Court GRANTS the motion and will issue a clarified version of the TRO. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on May 21, 2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on May 21, 2022. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)VIDEO Court Hearing re: #6 Amended Temporary Restraining Order set for 6/2/2022 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (hnw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by John Donley Adams on behalf of Envigo RMS, LLC (Adams, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Michael Santos on behalf of Envigo RMS, LLC (Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketJohn D. Adams, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Benjamin J. Razi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3959591. by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Adams, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Benjamin J. Razi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on June 1, 2022. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing re #6 Temporary Restraining Order by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Joint MOTION To Extend Temporary Restraining Order and Continue Preliminary Injunction Hearing re #6 Amended Temporary Restraining Order. Tomorrow's preliminary injunction hearing is CONTINUED, and the terms of the TRO are hereby EXTENDED for 14 days. The parties are DIRECTED to contact Carmen Amos to reschedule the preliminary injunction hearing for a date on or around June 13, 2022. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on June 1, 2022. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Cancellation of VIDEO Court Hearing re: #6 Amended Temporary Restraining Order set for 6/2/2022 at 10:30 AM. (Cancel Court Reporter) (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Video-Conference Hearing: (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings). Court Hearing re: Preliminary Injunction set for June 13, 2022 at 1:00 PM via Zoom before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J Razi on behalf of Envigo RMS, LLC (Razi, Benjamin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Samantha Moffitt, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Amy Taylor, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - May 2022 Inspection Report, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Examples of Overcrowded Enclosures)(Hollingsworth, Mary) (Entered: 06/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) First RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support by John Sagartz, #2 Declaration in Support by Carmen Wilbourn, #3 Declaration in Support by Len Edward Murray, #4 Declaration in Support by Jeannie Perron, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Perron Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Perron Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C to Perron Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit D to Perron Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit E to Perron Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit F to Perron Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G to Perron Declaration)(Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon: Motion Hearing held on 6/13/2022 via ZOOM, re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by United States Of America. (Court Reporter: Judy Webb) (ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/17/2022. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER; granting in part and denying in part #17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as set forth herein. To better facilitate a speedy resolution, both parties are further DIRECTED to confer and inform the Court, by 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, June 22, 2022, of their plan for transferring all remaining animals out of the Cumberland facility. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/17/2022. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORAL ORDER: Good cause having been shown, the Government's unopposed motion for extension of time, Dkt. #23 , is GRANTED. The parties shall have until 5:00 p.m. on June 24, 2022 to present the Court with a joint plan to transfer the remaining beagles out of the Cumberland facility. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on June 22, 2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ca)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Consent of the Court to Proceed with Fulfilling Existing Customer Orders by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support by Michael C. Garrett, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Garrett Declaration)(Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION Motion for Clarification re #21 Memorandum Opinion, #22 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Virginia Secretary of State Entity Information: Envigo Global Services Inc. (entity ID F0526493), #2 Exhibit Virginia Secretary of State Entity Information: Envigo RMS, LLC (entity ID T0806093))(Panda, Shampa)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Transfer Plan by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION Motion for Clarification re #21 Memorandum Opinion, #22 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, . filed by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Consent of the Court to Proceed with Fulfilling Existing Customer Orders . filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Mary Hollingsworth)(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER denying as moot #25 Motion for Consent of the Court to Proceed with Fulfilling Existing Customer Orders; granting #26 MOTION Motion for Clarification re #21 Memorandum Opinion, #22 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Transfer Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/27/2022. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION for Reconsideration re #30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document, by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition re #31 MOTION for Reconsideration re #30 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Document, . filed by United States Of America. (Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Transfer Plan by Envigo RMS, LLC. (Santos, Brandon)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER denying #31 Motion for Reconsideration; denying #33 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Document Joint Transfer Plan. The Government has until 1:00 p.m. on July 1, 2022, to submit its plan for the expeditious removal of all dogs remaining at the Cumberland facility. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 6/30/2022. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE by United States Of America of Joint Transfer Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Transfer Plan)(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#36) ORAL ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint plan to transfer all animals remaining at the Cumberland facility. Upon review, the plan is APPROVED. Moreover, it appearing proper to do so, the Government's request for a 10-day extension of time, Dkt. 35, is GRANTED. It is so ORDERED. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/5/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Transfer Plan)(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) CONSENT DECREE. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 7/15/2022. (al)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States Of America. Envigo RMS, LLC waiver sent on 7/14/2022, answer due 9/12/2022.(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss Complaint by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore R. Wasky)(Hollingsworth, Mary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • Docket(#41) ORAL ORDER: Consistent with the terms of Parties' consent decree, Dkt. 38, the Court GRANTS the United States' motion to dismiss its Complaint with prejudice, Dkt. 40. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/14/22. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(al)

    Read MoreRead Less