This case was last updated from PACER on 12/24/2019 at 08:22:46 (UTC).

United States of America v. Eisentraut

Case Summary

On 10/25/2019 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Eisentraut. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard Mills and Tom Schanzle-Haskins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03249

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Mills

Referral Judge

Tom Schanzle-Haskins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Jeffrey Eisentraut

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hilary W Frooman

Attorney at US ATTY

318 South Sixth Street

Springfield, IL 62701-1806

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service of copy of Order to Show Cause, Petition, Declaration, Last Chance Letter, Summons and Certicate of Service of Summons by personal delivery to Defendant Jeffrey Eisentraut. (Frooman, Hilary) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Richard Mills on 12/4/2019. Respondent, Jeffrey Eisentraut ordered to appear before the U S District Court on 1/8/2020 at 2:00 p.m. to show cause why he should not be compelled to obey the IRS summons served upon him on 4/16/2019. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Service of copy of Order to Show Cause, Petition, Declaration, Last Chance Letter, Summons and Certicate of Service of Summons by personal delivery to Defendant Jeffrey Eisentraut. (Frooman, Hilary) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE entered by Judge Richard Mills on 12/4/2019. Respondent, Jeffrey Eisentraut ordered to appear before the U S District Court on 1/8/2020 at 2:00 p.m. to show cause why he should not be compelled to obey the IRS summons served upon him on 4/16/2019. (SEE WRITTEN ORDER) (MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(MAS, ilcd) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less