This case was last updated from PACER on 12/07/2019 at 07:26:57 (UTC).

United States of America v. Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency et al

Case Summary

On 10/08/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars 84,587 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony P. Patti, Bernard A. Friedman, David R. Grand and Nancy G. Edmunds. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-12944

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Anthony P. Patti

David R. Grand

Presiding Judges

Bernard A. Friedman

Nancy G. Edmunds

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimant

Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.

Defendants

Eighty-Four Thousand Five Hundred Eighty-Seven Dollars ($84,587.00) in U.S. Currency

One Thousand Forty-Nine (1,049) Electronic Items and Accessories, Including, Without Limitation, Cell Phones, Tablets, Laptops, Desktop Computers, Cameras, Thermostats, Security Systems, Keyboards, He

Twenty-Five Thousand Nine Hundred Sixty-Five Dollars and Eighty-Four Cents ($25,965.84) in U.S. Currency from New Horizons Credit Union Account Number xxxxx3059

Two Hundred Forty-Six Thousand Five Hundred Fifty-Four Dollars and Eighty-Six Cents ($246,554.86) in U.S. Currency from JPMorgan Chase Bank Account Number xxxxxxxxxxx1373

Sixty Thousand Dollars ($60,000.00) in U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adriana Dydell

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

211 West Fort Street, Suite 2001

Detroit, MI 48226-3220

Claimant Attorneys

Gregory P. Rogers

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius,

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jeanne M. Cors

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius,

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne M. Cors on behalf of Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Cors, Jeanne) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

10 #1

Receipts for Seized Assets

#10

(#10) CLAIM by Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipts for Seized Assets) (Rogers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#8

(#8) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Warrant Issued, #2 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, #5 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Dydell, Adriana) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#5

(#5) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#4

(#4) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#2

(#2) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cr-20389, Judge Honorable Nancy G. Edmunds] (Dydell, Adriana) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne M. Cors on behalf of Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Cors, Jeanne) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLAIM by Prime Cellular Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Receipts for Seized Assets) (Rogers, Gregory) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Bernard A. Friedman and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti to District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Warrant Issued, #2 Warrant Issued, #3 Warrant Issued, #4 Warrant Issued, #1 Complaint,, #5 Warrant Issued by United States of America (Dydell, Adriana) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Warrant of Arrest and Notice In Rem Issued. (NAhm) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE filed by United States of America against All Defendants. No summons requested. No Fee Required - US Government. County of 1st Plaintiff: USA - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court for the Eastern District of Michigan, 19-cr-20389, Judge Honorable Nancy G. Edmunds] (Dydell, Adriana) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.