This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 07:26:32 (UTC).

United States of America v. Eickhoff, Jr. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 United States of America filed a Tax - Tax Claim lawsuit against Eickhoff, Jr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Willie J. Epps, Jr and M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04027

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Tax - Tax Claim

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Willie J. Epps, Jr

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Washington, DC 20044

Defendants

John Hugo Eickhoff, Jr.

Rhonda Kaye Eickhoff

Hoffman Associates, LLC

Aric Elliot Schreiner

Columbia CPA Group LLC

John William Gray II

Damon Thomas Eisma doing business as Damon T. Eisma Attorney at Law

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell J. Edelstein

Attorney at US Dept. of Justice

Po Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044

Justin Michael Fontaine

Attorney at DOJ-Tax

P.O. Box 7238

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Justin Michael Fontaine on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Justin Michael Fontaine added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of United States of America.(Edelstein, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to John Hugo Eickhoff, Jr. on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Rhonda Kaye Eickhoff on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Hoffman Associates, LLC on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Aric Elliot Schreiner on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Columbia CPA Group LLC on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to John William Gray II on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Damon Thomas Eisma on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Damon Thomas Eisma on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to John William Gray II on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Columbia CPA Group LLC on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Aric Elliot Schreiner on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Hoffman Associates, LLC on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to Rhonda Kaye Eickhoff on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by United States of America. Waiver sent to John Hugo Eickhoff, Jr. on 3/11/2022, answer due 5/10/2022. (Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of United States of America.(Edelstein, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Case reassigned to District Judge M. Douglas Harpool for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Please note the new case number: 22-cv-4027-MDH. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of appearance by Justin Michael Fontaine on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Justin Michael Fontaine added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Fontaine, Justin) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Russell J. Edelstein on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 5/24/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelstein, Russell) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell J Edelstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Fontaine