This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2019 at 09:05:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. Dittrich

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 a Property - Other Eviction case was filed by United States of America against Dittrich in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00065

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Ruth Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Rembrandt Dittrich

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit 2

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Rembrandt Dittrich filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration of Ludric Smith, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hewlett, Joycelyn) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Exhibit 5

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Rembrandt Dittrich served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Hewlett, Joycelyn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Rembrandt Dittrich. (KAB) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

1 #6

Declaration of Ludric Smith

1 #1

Exhibit 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Rembrandt Dittrich served on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Hewlett, Joycelyn) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • (#3) CLERK'S NOTICE to Parties of Consent and Reference of A Civil Action to Magistrate Judge with a copy of Notice attached to each summons (KAB) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Rembrandt Dittrich. (KAB) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Rembrandt Dittrich filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration of Ludric Smith, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hewlett, Joycelyn) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.