This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2020 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) P710C Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C589182 et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against CZ Ceska Zbrojovka P710C Pistol, Cal 9, SN C589182. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02187

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Defendants

Sig Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039012

CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) Scorpion Evo 3 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C935907

Sig-Sauer P220 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 37C006736

Heckler & Koch USP45 Tactical Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 25-158992

Heckler & Koch SP5 K Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 215-008207

Heckler & Koch P30L V3 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 213-026385

Sig-Sauer P938 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 52E059697

Colt Combat Elite Defender Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: DF003416

Sig-Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039013

CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) P710C Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C589182

Heckler & Koch HK45C Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 216-016320

Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. Sub-2000 Rifle, Cal: 9, SN: FFBX46

Sig-Sauer P365 XL Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 66A485390

Sig-Sauer P320 M17 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: M17116313

Sig Sauer P229 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 55E030434

CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) A01-LD Pistol, Cal: 9mm, SN: Z220323

Colt Combat Elite Government Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: GV002891

CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) CZ75 TS Czechmate Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C316723

Sig-Sauer P220 Legion Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 37C004109

Sig Sauer P320 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 58H045432

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

James Alexander Blum

Attorney at Office of the United States Attorney

501 Las Vegas Blvd. S,, Ste.1100

Las Vegas, NV 89101

 

Court Documents

#4

#3

2 #19

Summons Colt Combat Elite Government Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: GV002891

2 #18

Summons Colt Combat Elite Defender Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: DF003416

2 #17

Summons Colt Combat Elite Commander Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: CD000681

2 #16

Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) Scorpion Evo 3 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C935907

2 #15

Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) CZ75 TS Czechmate Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C316723

2 #14

Summons Heckler & Koch HK45C Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 216-016320

2 #13

Summons Sig Sauer P320 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 58H045432

2 #12

Summons Sig-Sauer P365 XL Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 66A485390

2 #11

Summons Sig-Sauer P220 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 37C006736

2 #10

Summons Sig-Sauer P938 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 52E059697

2 #9

Summons Sig Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039012

2 #8

Summons Sig Sauer P229 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 55E030434

2 #4

Summons Sig-Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039013

2 #3

Summons Sig-Sauer P320 M17 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: M17116313

2 #2

Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) A01-LD Pistol, Cal: 9mm, SN: Z220323

2 #1

Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) P710C Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C589182

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons and Warrant of Arrest in Rem for Property (JM) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Summonses and Warrants of Arrest in Rem for Property and Notice. the United States shall file proof of publication and service with the Clerk (see order for details). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #1 Complaint in Forfeiture, by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) P710C Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C589182, #2 Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) A01-LD Pistol, Cal: 9mm, SN: Z220323, #3 Summons Sig-Sauer P320 M17 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: M17116313, #4 Summons Sig-Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039013, #5 Summons Sig-Sauer P220 Legion Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 37C004109, #6 Summons Keltec, CNC Industries, Inc. Sub-2000 Rifle, Cal: 9, SN: FFBX46, #7 Summons Heckler & Koch USP40 Tactical Pistol, Cal: 40, SN: 22-116190, #8 Summons Sig Sauer P229 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 55E030434, #9 Summons Sig Sauer P226 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 47E039012, #10 Summons Sig-Sauer P938 Legion Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 52E059697, #11 Summons Sig-Sauer P220 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 37C006736, #12 Summons Sig-Sauer P365 XL Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 66A485390, #13 Summons Sig Sauer P320 X-Five Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 58H045432, #14 Summons Heckler & Koch HK45C Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 216-016320, #15 Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) CZ75 TS Czechmate Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C316723, #16 Summons CZ (Ceska Zbrojovka) Scorpion Evo 3 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: C935907, #17 Summons Colt Combat Elite Commander Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: CD000681, #18 Summons Colt Combat Elite Defender Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: DF003416, #19 Summons Colt Combat Elite Government Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: GV002891, #20 Summons Arsenal Co. Bulgaria SAM7K Pistol, Cal: 762, SN: AE534217, #21 Summons Heckler & Koch USP45 Tactical Pistol, Cal: 45, SN: 25-158992, #22 Summons Heckler & Koch P30L Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 213-028988, #23 Summons Heckler & Koch P30L V3 Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 213-026385, #24 Summons Heckler & Koch SP5 K Pistol, Cal: 9, SN: 215-008207)(Blum, James) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT IN FORFEITURE against All Defendants by United States of America. Proof of service due by 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blum, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Alexander Blum