This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/12/2021 at 11:19:47 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Collada et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Collada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Chris M. McAliley. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-25077

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Chris M. McAliley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Maritza Collada

Lina Sara Ruiz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Lauren Michelle Bluestein

99 N.E. 4Th Street

Miami, FL 33132

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Richard John Diaz

3127 Ponce De Leon Boulevard

Coral Gables, FL 33134-6816

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Complaint Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit C

1 #5

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit A

1 #3

Summon(s) Lina Sara Ruiz

1 #2

Summon(s) Maritza Collada

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' joint stipulation for dismissal without prejudice #9 . Upon review of the stipulation and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All hearings, trial settings, and deadlines are CANCELED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 1/22/2021. (shy) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bluestein, Lauren) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Lina Sara Ruiz, Maritza Collada. Attorney Richard John Diaz added to party Maritza Collada(pty:dft), Attorney Richard John Diaz added to party Lina Sara Ruiz(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Diaz, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Lina Sara Ruiz served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bluestein, Lauren) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Maritza Collada served on 12/21/2020, answer due 1/11/2021. (Bluestein, Lauren) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES.REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 12/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Lina Sara Ruiz. (mee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Maritza Collada. (mee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Maritza Collada, #3 Summon(s) Lina Sara Ruiz, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Complaint Cover Sheet)(Bluestein, Lauren) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Michelle Bluestein