This case was last updated from PACER on 04/14/2019 at 07:33:47 (UTC).

United States of America v. Chilsom et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Chilsom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Myron H. Thompson and Wallace Capel, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-MC-03855

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

Referral Judge

Wallace Capel, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Bobbie Jean Chilsom

Montgomery, AL 36104

Garnishee

Family Dollar Stores

10301 Monroe Rd

Matthews, NC 28105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Joseph DuBois

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 197

Montgomery, AL 36101

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment & #2 Writ of Garnishment, served on Family Dollar Stores on 3/1/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

#2

(#2) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

1 #3

Right to Claim Exemption

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America (DuBois, James) Modified on 2/21/2019 to clarify text to reflect as Corporate/conflict disclosure (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

1 #5

Answer of Garnishee Form

#4

(#4) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed as to #2 Writ of Garnishment served on Bobbie Jean Chilsom on 3/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

1 #4

Proposed Writ

1 #2

Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor

1 #1

Instructions to Garnishee

#7

(#7) ORDER directing that the government's unopposed motion to reduce the wage withholding amount under the #6 writ of garnishment is granted, and the amount of withholding is reduced from 25% of disposable earnings each pay period to 12% of disposable earnings each pay period; DIRECTING the clerk of court to mail a copy of this order to the garnishee. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/2019. Furnished Copy to garnishee. (am, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Modify Garnishment by United States of America. (DuBois, James) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER directing that the government's unopposed motion to reduce the wage withholding amount under the #6 writ of garnishment is granted, and the amount of withholding is reduced from 25% of disposable earnings each pay period to 12% of disposable earnings each pay period; DIRECTING the clerk of court to mail a copy of this order to the garnishee. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 4/5/2019. Furnished Copy to garnishee. (am, ) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Modify Garnishment by United States of America. (DuBois, James) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Application for Writ of Garnishment & #2 Writ of Garnishment, served on Family Dollar Stores on 3/1/2019. (alm, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN Executed as to #2 Writ of Garnishment served on Bobbie Jean Chilsom on 3/11/2019. Acknowledgement filed by United States of America. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America (DuBois, James) Modified on 2/21/2019 to clarify text to reflect as Corporate/conflict disclosure (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (kr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Right to Claim Exemption, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form)(kr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less