This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 10:36:14 (UTC).

United States of America v. Bradford et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Bradford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Susan Russ Walker and Myron H. Thompson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-MC-03860

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan Russ Walker

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Derris Bradford

Derris Deanthony Bradford

Garnishee

The Juicy Crab

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Joseph DuBois

Attorney at U. S. Attorney's Office

Po Box 197

Montgomery, AL 36101

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's #4 motion to dismiss garnishment, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the #2 writ of garnishment is dismissed. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/11/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Garnishment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBois, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#2

(#2) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

1 #5

Answer of Garnishee Form

1 #4

Proposed Writ

1 #3

Claim for Exemption Form

1 #2

Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor

1 #1

Instructions to Garnishee

#1

(#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America.(Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Claim for Exemption Form, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form) (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Upon consideration of the government's #4 motion to dismiss garnishment, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and the #2 writ of garnishment is dismissed. This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 7/11/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss Garnishment by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DuBois, James) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued & furnished to USMS for service. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by United States of America. (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION for Writ of Garnishment, filed by United States of America.(Attachments: #1 Instructions to Garnishee, #2 Notice of Garnishment and Instructions to Debtor, #3 Claim for Exemption Form, #4 Proposed Writ, #5 Answer of Garnishee Form) (alm, ) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.