This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2020 at 11:09:09 (UTC).

United States of America v. Braden

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Braden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00563

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Ashley M. Braden

Not Classified By Court

Warning Order Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William F. Campbell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Katherine A. Bell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Jeffrey S. Moad

Attorney at Stites & Harbison, PLLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 1800

Louisville, KY 40202-3352

 

Court Documents

7 #2

Exhibit 2 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 279 Tennessee Ct

7 #1

Exhibit 1 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 360 Circle Dr

#7

(#7) WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 360 Circle Dr, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 279 Tennessee Ct) by Warning Order Attorney. (Moad, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

#6

(#6) WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/20/2020 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Jeffrey S. Moad for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

5 #2

Proposed Order

5 #1

Affidavit for Issuance

#5

(#5) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for ASHLEY M. BRADEN by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B- Real Estate Mortgage

1 #1

Exhibit A- Promissory Note

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashley M. Braden, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet) (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 360 Circle Dr, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Ashley M. Braden - 279 Tennessee Ct) by Warning Order Attorney. (Moad, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WARNING ORDER AND ORDER APPOINTING WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 8/20/2020 granting #5 Warning Order. Attorney Jeffrey S. Moad for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel (SMJ) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment for ASHLEY M. BRADEN by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Issuance, #2 Proposed Order) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ashley M. Braden, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit B- Real Estate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C- Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #4 Cover Sheet) (SRH) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less