This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 07:45:53 (UTC).

United States of America v. Boll et al

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 a Property - Foreclosure case was filed by United States of America against Boll in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00138

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg N. Stivers

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Betty P. Boll

Unknown Spouse of Betty P. Boll

Not Yet Classified

Warning Order Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa R. Dixon

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder Law Offices, PLLC

1222 1/2 N. Main Street, Suite 2

London, KY 40741

Not Yet Classified Attorney

D. Gaines Penn

Attorney at English, Lucas, Priest & Owsley LLP

1101 College Street, P.O. Box 770

Bowling Green, KY 42102-0770

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Affidavit Affidavit for Fee

11 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Award of Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility

#11

(#11) WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT and MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fee and Discharge (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Fee, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Award of Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified to add text on 11/27/2019 (CDF). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF FILING re #11 Warning Order Attorney Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Billing Statement) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified event text and added link on 11/27/2019 (CDF). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A- Billing Statement

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty P. Boll served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION Request for Fee Refund by Plaintiff United States of America (Dixon, Melissa) Modified on 10/8/2019-Motion terminated. Filed incorrectly (MLG). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon

#9

(#9) ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BETTY P. BOLL Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/7/2019 granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney D. Gaines Penn for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendant(s) (CDF) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Betty P. Boll. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C-Mortgage

1 #5

Exhibit D-Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit A-Promissory Note

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Tendered Summons by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

4 #1

Summons

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility (SEE DN #11 to view PDF document.) by Warning Order Attorney. (CDF) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF FILING re #11 Warning Order Attorney Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Billing Statement) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified event text and added link on 11/27/2019 (CDF). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY REPORT and MOTION for Warning Order Attorney Fee and Discharge (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit for Fee, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Award of Fee and Discharge from Further Responsibility) by Warning Order Attorney. (Penn, D.) Modified to add text on 11/27/2019 (CDF). (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Betty P. Boll served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of email confirmation as to Melissa Dixson re #5 Request for Fee Refund (MLG) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF WARNING ORDER ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENDANT, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BETTY P. BOLL Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 10/7/2019 granting #6 Warning Order. Attorney D. Gaines Penn for Warning Order Attorney appointed. cc: Counsel; Defendant(s) (CDF) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Betty P. Boll. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • (#7) TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/03/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Warning Order and Attorney Appointment by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney, Melissa R. Dixon, #2 Proposed Order) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION Request for Fee Refund by Plaintiff United States of America (Dixon, Melissa) Modified on 10/8/2019-Motion terminated. Filed incorrectly (MLG). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Tendered Summons by United States of America re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Dixon, Melissa) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE ON SUMMONS re #1 Complaint. See Notice for instructions. (JWM) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (JWM) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Betty P. Boll, Unknown Spouse of Betty P. Boll, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Promissory Note, #4 Exhibit C-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit D-Subsidy Repayment Agreement, #6 Exhibit E-Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #7 Exhibit F-Affidavit of Kimberly Williamson, #8 Exhibit G-Field Inspection) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2019: #9 Summons) (JWM). (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.