This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2020 at 10:15:45 (UTC).

United States of America v. Black et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 United States of America filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Black. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas B. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00144

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas B. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

Andrea Martha Black

Adam Lee Black

Any Unknown Spouse of Andrea Martha Black

Any Unknown Spouse of Adam Lee Black

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William F. Campbell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

Katherine A. Bell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office - Louisville

717 W. Broadway

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Andrea Martha Black and Dale L. Leftridge. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (SRH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

8 #2

Summons for Dale L. Leftridge, spouse of Andrea Martha Black

8 #1

Summons for Andrea Martha Black

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons for Andrea Martha Black, #2 Summons for Dale L. Leftridge, spouse of Andrea Martha Black) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Adam Lee Black. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (DJT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/26/20 : IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Paducah Division, Western District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned to that division. See LR 3.2(a). All future filings related to this action must be filed under the Paducah Division case number. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action.cc: Counsel (DJT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Adam Lee Black. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage

1 #2

Exhibit A-Promissory Note

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Any Unknown Spouse of Adam Lee Black, Any Unknown Spouse of Andrea Martha Black, Adam Lee Black, Andrea Martha Black, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement) (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Andrea Martha Black and Dale L. Leftridge. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (SRH) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONSES by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons for Andrea Martha Black, #2 Summons for Dale L. Leftridge, spouse of Andrea Martha Black) (Campbell, William) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Returned Unexecuted by United States of America as to Adam Lee Black. (Campbell, William) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. (DJT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSenior Judge Thomas B. Russell added. Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (DJT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/26/20 : IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Paducah Division, Western District of Kentucky for re-allotment to a judge assigned to that division. See LR 3.2(a). All future filings related to this action must be filed under the Paducah Division case number. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action.cc: Counsel (DJT) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 8/25/20: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Adam Lee Black. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against Any Unknown Spouse of Adam Lee Black, Any Unknown Spouse of Andrea Martha Black, Adam Lee Black, Andrea Martha Black, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Promissory Note, #3 Exhibit B-Real Estate Mortgage, #4 Exhibit C-Subsidy Repayment Agreement) (DJT) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less