This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 10:54:41 (UTC).

United States of America v. Armonat

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 United States of America filed an Other lawsuit against Armonat. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy M Cain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-02538

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy M Cain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Brian L Armonat

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert M Sneed

Attorney at US Attorneys Office (Cola)

1441 Main Street, Suite 500

Columbia, SC 29201

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Brian L Armonat. (kmca) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(kmca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #8

Exhibit 3 Verification of Complaint

1 #7

Exhibit 2 USAO-DSC ltr, 11-25-2019, to Mr. Armonat

1 #6

Exhibit Attachment E, FAA referral of Debt to U.S. Treasury

1 #5

Exhibit Attachment D, FAA 12-2-2015 Order of Assessment

1 #4

Exhibit Attachment C, FAA 11-5-2015 Notice Proposed Assessment

1 #3

Exhibit Attachment B, FAA 10-5-2015 Demand letter

1 #2

Exhibit Attachment A, FAA 9-2-2015 Emergency Order

1 #1

Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jessica Kabaz-Gomez

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION against Brian L Armonat, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jessica Kabaz-Gomez, #2 Exhibit Attachment A, FAA 9-2-2015 Emergency Order, #3 Exhibit Attachment B, FAA 10-5-2015 Demand letter, #4 Exhibit Attachment C, FAA 11-5-2015 Notice Proposed Assessment, #5 Exhibit Attachment D, FAA 12-2-2015 Order of Assessment, #6 Exhibit Attachment E, FAA referral of Debt to U.S. Treasury, #7 Exhibit 2 USAO-DSC ltr, 11-25-2019, to Mr. Armonat, #8 Exhibit 3 Verification of Complaint)(kmca) Modified on 7/7/2020: to add text (verified...) (kmca). (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/15/2020: to replace with redacted copy as requested by and provide by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Brian L Armonat. (kmca) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States of America.(kmca) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTION against Brian L Armonat, filed by United States of America. Service due by 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Jessica Kabaz-Gomez, #2 Exhibit Attachment A, FAA 9-2-2015 Emergency Order, #3 Exhibit Attachment B, FAA 10-5-2015 Demand letter, #4 Exhibit Attachment C, FAA 11-5-2015 Notice Proposed Assessment, #5 Exhibit Attachment D, FAA 12-2-2015 Order of Assessment, #6 Exhibit Attachment E, FAA referral of Debt to U.S. Treasury, #7 Exhibit 2 USAO-DSC ltr, 11-25-2019, to Mr. Armonat, #8 Exhibit 3 Verification of Complaint)(kmca) Modified on 7/7/2020: to add text (verified...) (kmca). (Attachment 6 replaced on 7/15/2020: to replace with redacted copy as requested by and provide by filing user) (kmca). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less