This case was last updated from PACER on 08/15/2021 at 08:46:29 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AON PLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against AON PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01633

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendants

AON PLC

WILLIS TOWERS WATSON, PLC

901 N. Glebe Road

Arlington, VA 22203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Henderson Jones, II

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street, Nw, Room 4000

Washington, DC 20001

Eric Damian Welsh

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Peter M. Bozzo

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530-0001

Andrew James Robinson

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Curtis Wayne Strong

Attorney at DOJ-ATR

450 5Th St

Washington, DC 20001

Justin T. Heipp

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street Nw, Suite 4100

Washington, DC 20011

Patricia Leigh Sindel

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

450 Fifth Street Nw, Suite 7100

Washington, DC 20530

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Marcellus Williamson

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Daniel M Wall

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Ian Robert Conner

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 11Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Lawrence E. Buterman

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1304

Marguerite Mitchell Sullivan

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 11Th Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Michael G Egge

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS, LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Tara Lynn Tavernia

Attorney at LATHAM & WATKINS LLP

555 11Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Clifford Hank Aronson

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

4 Times Square

New York, NY 10036

David P. Wales

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

1440 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Karen Hoffman Lent

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Matthew M Martino, I

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Matthew Lisagar

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Michael Sheerin

Attorney at SKADDEN, ARPS, SLATE, MEAGHER & FLOM LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#53

(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jones, William) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#52

(#52) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

51 #1

Exhibit

51 #51

Main Document

#50

(#50) ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 20, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the government shall produce to the defendants the investigation materials referred to in the parties' #48 Joint Status Report Regarding a Scheduling and Case Management Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2021, the government shall respond to the defendants' special interrogatories. The government's responses shall comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 16, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the deadlines for the defendants to propose additional settlement offers for adjudication at trial and for the parties to agree on whether a consent decree will be filed on Counts III through V of the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the government's proposed language regarding Paragraph 25 of the proposed scheduling and case management order shall not be included in the proposed scheduling and case management order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint proposed scheduling and case management order, reflecting the Court's rulings. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall advise the Court in writing as to whether the hearing currently scheduled for July 21, 2021, is necessary to resolve a dispute regarding the deadlines for settlement offers and a consent decree. It is further ORDERED that, on July 21, 2021, at 3:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a security code required to access the status conference. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-273-3658 and entering the public access code (1809972). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 16, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

48 #3

Exhibit 2

48 #2

Exhibit 1

48 #1

Exhibit Index

48 #48

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Marcellus Williamson on behalf of AON PLC (Williamson, Edward) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE. AON PLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Jones, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

6 #1

Summons

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Wayne Strong on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Strong, Curtis) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Leigh Sindel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sindel, Patricia) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Heipp on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Heipp, Justin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#2

(#2) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. In light of the plaintiff's #53 Notice of Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 26, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jones, William) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' #51 Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling and Case Management Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the status conference previously scheduled for July 21, 2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 20, 2021. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jones, William) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 20, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the government shall produce to the defendants the investigation materials referred to in the parties' #48 Joint Status Report Regarding a Scheduling and Case Management Order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 26, 2021, the government shall respond to the defendants' special interrogatories. The government's responses shall comply with the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 16, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer regarding the deadlines for the defendants to propose additional settlement offers for adjudication at trial and for the parties to agree on whether a consent decree will be filed on Counts III through V of the Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the government's proposed language regarding Paragraph 25 of the proposed scheduling and case management order shall not be included in the proposed scheduling and case management order. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint proposed scheduling and case management order, reflecting the Court's rulings. It is further ORDERED that, on or before July 19, 2021, at 5:00 p.m., the parties shall advise the Court in writing as to whether the hearing currently scheduled for July 21, 2021, is necessary to resolve a dispute regarding the deadlines for settlement offers and a consent decree. It is further ORDERED that, on July 21, 2021, at 3:00 p.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with a security code required to access the status conference. Members of the public are advised to dial in by calling 1-888-273-3658 and entering the public access code (1809972). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 16, 2021. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference/Oral Argument held on 7/15/2021. A written order will issue from Chambers. Status Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 03:00 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Lisa Edwards) (hs) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on July 15, 2021; Page Numbers: 1-51. Date of Issuance: July 15, 2021. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Edwards. Telephone number (202) 354-3269. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court re porter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2021.(Edwards, Lisa) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding a Scheduling and Case Management Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Jones, William) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 7/12/2021. Status Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Marcellus Williamson on behalf of AON PLC (Williamson, Edward) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE. AON PLC waiver sent on 6/16/2021, answer due 8/15/2021. (Jones, William) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Jones, William) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Wayne Strong on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Strong, Curtis) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Leigh Sindel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sindel, Patricia) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/24/2021) (ztth). (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Heipp on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Heipp, Justin) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case randomly reassigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. Judge Carl J. Nichols is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to bill.jones2@usdoj.gov, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Do no include the date for your summons (adh, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Jones, William) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Willis Towers Watson Public Limited Company is a litigant

Latest cases where AON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William H. Jones, II