This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2022 at 09:05:14 (UTC).

United States of America v. Americredit Financial Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 United States of America filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Americredit Financial Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark Pittman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00887

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark Pittman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendant

Americredit Financial Services, Inc. doing business as GM Financial

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan Arnel Martinson

Audrey M Yap

Lisa Robin Hasday-DOJ

Elizabeth A. Singer

Sameena Shina Majed

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit(s) Consent Order

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#5

(#5) CONSENT ORDER (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/3/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

#6

(#6) AMENDED CONSENT ORDER: (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/4/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

#7

(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the amended consent order entered on October 4, 2022, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/16/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the amended consent order entered on October 4, 2022, it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this civil action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/16/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED CONSENT ORDER: (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/4/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT ORDER (see order) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/3/2022) (mmw) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Entry of Consent Order filed by United States of America with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Consent Order) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States of America. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Americredit Financial Services, Inc. filed by United States of America. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Hasday-DOJ, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less