Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2021 at 08:43:39 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BELLA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208124 et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BELLA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208124. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Boasberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01791

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Boasberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Claimants

SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC

OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD.

MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

Defendants

ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE LUNA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208100

ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BELLA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208124

ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE PANDI WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9105073

ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BERING WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9149225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zia Mustafa Faruqui

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Michael Patrick Grady

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

555 4Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Brian P. Hudak

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Claimant Attorney

Erich C Ferrari

Attorney at FERRARI & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

1455 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

23 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#23

(#23) WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 1/18/2021..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD., SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/4/2021) (ztnr). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/4/2021) (ztnr). Modified on 1/19/2021 (znbn). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

21 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD., SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

#20

(#20) STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified to unseal on 10/29/2020 pursuant to #17 ORDER (zrdj). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/27/20. (znbn) Modified to unseal on 10/29/2020 pursuant to #17 ORDER (zrdj). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#5

(#6) WARRANT (1) for Arrest In Rem Issued (See Docket Entry #5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

4 #2

Warrant For Arrest In Rem

4 #1

Affidavit In Support

#4

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1139. (Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1989. (Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BELLA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208124, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BERING WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9149225, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE LUNA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208100, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE PANDI WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9105073 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Claimants' Counsel's #23 Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED; and 2) Claimants must find new counsel since entities must be represented; and 3) The Government shall file a further Joint Status Report by February 16, 2021. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/18/2021. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 1/18/2021..... MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD., SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/4/2021) (ztnr). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/4/2021) (ztnr). Modified on 1/19/2021 (znbn). (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SEALED MOTION filed by MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD., SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal for Leave to Withdraw. The Court ORDERS that counsel shall also file a public, redacted copy of the motion. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/30/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal a Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel by MOBIN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, OMAN FUEL TRADING LTD., SOHAR FUEL TRADING LLC FZC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferrari, Erich) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/8/2021. (znbn) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the Government's #20 Status Report and ORDERS that it shall file a further status report by January 8, 2020. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/23/2020. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified to unseal on 10/29/2020 pursuant to #17 ORDER (zrdj). (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/27/20. (znbn) Modified to unseal on 10/29/2020 pursuant to #17 ORDER (zrdj). (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Document 1, #3 Document 2, #4 Document 3)(Faruqui, Zia) Modified to unseal on 10/29/2020 pursuant to #17 ORDER (zrdj). (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WARRANT (1) for Arrest In Rem Issued (See Docket Entry #5 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/2/2020. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support, #2 Warrant For Arrest In Rem)(Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 20-cv-1139. (Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Case related to Case No. 19-cv-1989. (Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BELLA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208124, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE BERING WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9149225, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE LUNA WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9208100, ALL PETROLEUM-PRODUCT CARGO ABOARD THE PANDI WITH INTERNATIONAL MARITIME ORGANIZATION NUMBER 9105073 (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Faruqui, Zia) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erich C Ferrari