This case was last updated from PACER on 07/23/2019 at 08:23:09 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AL-IMAM

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against AL-IMAM. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher R. Cooper. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00079

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher R. Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Defendant

MUSTAFA MUHAMMAD MUFTAH AL-IMAM

Respondent

DAVID KIRKPATRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John M. Cummings, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

Judiciary Center Building, 555 Fourth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Karen Patricia Seifert

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 4Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J. Peed

Attorney at CLINTON & PEED

777 6Th Street, Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20001

Respondent Attorneys

Daniel Suleiman

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Kurt Andre Wimmer

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center, 662-5278

Washinton, DC 20001

Rebecca Isabella Yergin

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Suleiman, :Firm- COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, :Address- 850 10th Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - (202) 662-8511. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DAVID KIRKPATRICK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified spelling on 5/30/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kurt A. Wimmer, :Firm- COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, :Address- 850 10th Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - (202) 662-5278. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DAVID KIRKPATRICK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) MOTION TO QUASH filed by DAVID KIRKPATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd); ($47.00 fee to be paid) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SEALED OPINION and ORDER denying Motion #1 to Quash filed by DAVID KIRKPATRICK.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/31/19.(zlsj) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/29/2019. Motion #2 and #3 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorneys Kurt A. Wimmer and Daniel Suleman are GRANTED. Motion #1 to Quash; argued and RESERVED by the Court. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira) (lsj) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing fee received: re: #2 and #3 $ 200.00, receipt number: 4616098221. (ztd) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616098222. (ztd) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel Suleiman, :Firm- COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, :Address- 850 10th Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - (202) 662-8511. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DAVID KIRKPATRICK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified spelling on 5/30/2019 (ztd). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kurt A. Wimmer, :Firm- COVINGTON & BURLING LLP, :Address- 850 10th Street NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. Phone No. - (202) 662-5278. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by DAVID KIRKPATRICK (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION TO QUASH filed by DAVID KIRKPATRICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd); ($47.00 fee to be paid) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John M Cummings