This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2019 at 07:34:05 (UTC).

United States of America v. The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York

Case Summary

On 02/13/2019 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug lawsuit against The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence J. Vilardo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Controlled Substance/Drug

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence J. Vilardo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Claimants

Lauren Seitz

Five Star Bank

Anthony Gerace

Defendants

9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence Center, New York

The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard D. Kaufman

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

138 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

Claimant Attorneys

Justin S. White

Attorney at Shelby Bakshi & White

5662 Main Street

Williamsville, NY 14221

John K. McAndrew

Attorney at Woods Oviatt Gilman LLP

700 Crossroads Building, Two State Street

Rochester, NY 14614

Thomas J. Eoannou

484 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Certificate of Service

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Notice of Complaint For Forfeiture Against Real Property

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CLAIM by Anthony Gerace. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Lauren Seitz Statement 28 USC 1746 (White, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLAIM Forfeiture by Lauren Seitz. (White, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin S. White on behalf of Lauren Seitz (White, Justin) (Entered: 04/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Document missing claimant's electronic signature. Action required: re-file document with proper signature re #9 CLAIM by Anthony Gerace. (SG) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLAIM by Anthony Gerace (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Eoannou, Thomas) Modified on 4/4/2019 to correct filer (SG). (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN executed re Complaint (SG) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLAIM by Five Star Bank. (SG) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by United States of America (Declaration of Publication) (Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 03/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Complaint for Forfeiture Against Real Property Issued Forfeiture Hearing set for 5/3/2019 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (SG) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Kaufman on behalf of United States of America (Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verified Complaint For Forfeiture against 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence Center, New York, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Complaint For Forfeiture Against Real Property)(Kaufman, Richard) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Premises and Real Property with Buildings, Appurtenances and Improvements at 9070 Michael Douglas Drive, Clarence, New York is a litigant

Latest cases where Five Star Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jana Smoot White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Eoannou(Designation Retained)