This case was last updated from PACER on 10/26/2020 at 09:54:24 (UTC).

United States of America v. 865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances on Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit Debit Cards and 11,679.00 in U.S. Currency

Case Summary

On 08/27/2020 United States of America filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against 865,894 54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances on Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit Debit Cards and 11,679 00 in U S Currency. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07844

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

United States of America

Defendants

$865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, et al.

865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances on Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit Debit Cards and 11,679.00 in U.S. Currency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor A Rodgers, Jr

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER APPOINTING THE DEPARTMENT OFHOMELAND SECURITY CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION,AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE #6 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that upon the arrest of the defendants $865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances On Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit/Debit Cards and $11,679.00 In U.S. Currency, the Department of Homeland Security Customs and Border Protection Office of Fines, Penalties, and Forfeiture, 301 E. Ocean Boulevard, Long Beach, California 90802, shall assume custody of the defendants on behalf of this Court, in place of the United States Marshals Service, and shall maintain custody of such defendants during the time it remains in custodia legis, pursuant to Rule G(3)(c)(i) and E(4) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE. (lom) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#9

(#9) WARRANT for seizure of 865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances on Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit Debit Cards and 11,679.00 in U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian the Department of Homeland Security Customs and Border Protection in place of United States Marshals Service filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Memorandum Regarding Assignment of Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on August 27, 2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Victor A Rodgers, Jr added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER APPOINTING THE DEPARTMENT OFHOMELAND SECURITY CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION,AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE #6 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that upon the arrest of the defendants $865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances On Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit/Debit Cards and $11,679.00 In U.S. Currency, the Department of Homeland Security Customs and Border Protection Office of Fines, Penalties, and Forfeiture, 301 E. Ocean Boulevard, Long Beach, California 90802, shall assume custody of the defendants on behalf of this Court, in place of the United States Marshals Service, and shall maintain custody of such defendants during the time it remains in custodia legis, pursuant to Rule G(3)(c)(i) and E(4) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty or Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE. (lom) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WARRANT for seizure of 865,894.54 Seized From Three Bank And Credit Union Accounts, The Balances on Approximately Thirteen California Employment Development Department Benefit Debit Cards and 11,679.00 in U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Substitute Custodian the Department of Homeland Security Customs and Border Protection in place of United States Marshals Service filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Memorandum Regarding Assignment of Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff United States of America for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on August 27, 2020, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Victor A Rodgers, Jr added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Rodgers, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less